This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2023 at 07:58:17 (UTC).

Williams v. State of Mississippi et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Williams filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against State of Mississippi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Wilhelmina M. Wright and Dulce J. Foster. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-00086

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

Referral Judge

Dulce J. Foster

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Merlin Lkent Williams

Defendants

State of Mississippi

Muriel B. Ellis

Jim M. GreenLee

Virginia Carter Carltan

Leslie D. King

Michael K. Randolph

Harrison County Sheriff Department A.D.C

Troy Peterson

Gulfport Police Department

Jerry Birmingham

Harrison County Circuit Court

Christopher Louis Schmidt

Eddwena Marie Myles

Frieda Henry

Virginia Dixie McKay

Cherish Gibbs

Mississippi Department of Corrections

Richard Pennington

8 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

*Restricted*

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #3

Envelope

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Merlin Lkent Williams re #1 Prisoner Complaint, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Merlin Lkent Williams (JGK) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (JGK)Qc'd (KNK). (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(MTB) Document QC'd on 2/23/2023 (ABR). (Entered: 02/10/2023)

5 #1

Exhibit(s)

5 #2

Envelope

#6

(#6) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTB) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

6 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Change of Address by Merlin Lkent Williams (MTB) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#8

(#8) PERSONAL INTEREST IN A PARTICULAR PROTECTED PROPERTY RIGHT filed by Merlin Lkent Williams.(MTB) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#9

(#9) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (MTB) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that: (1) This matter be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a); (2) Mr. Williams's applications to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Nos. #2 & #9 ) be DENIED AS MOOT; and (3) Mr. Williams's Motion for Leave to File (ECF No. #6 ) be DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 3/2/2023. (MEH) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (MTB) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PERSONAL INTEREST IN A PARTICULAR PROTECTED PROPERTY RIGHT filed by Merlin Lkent Williams.(MTB) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Change of Address by Merlin Lkent Williams (MTB) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTB) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(MTB) Document QC'd on 2/23/2023 (ABR). (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. (JGK)Qc'd (KNK). (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Merlin Lkent Williams re #1 Prisoner Complaint, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Merlin Lkent Williams (JGK) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Jerry Birmingham, Burl Cain, Virginia Carter Carltan, Joseph Cooley, Muriel B. Ellis, Cherish Gibbs, Jim M. GreenLee, Louis Guirola, Jr, Gulfport Police Department, Harrison County Circuit Court, Harrison County Sheriff Department A.D.C, Frieda Henry, Leslie D. King, Ron King, Virginia Dixie McKay, Mahie M. McMillin, Mississippi Department of Corrections, Robert P. Myers, Eddwena Marie Myles, Richard Pennington, Troy Peterson, Michael K. Randolph, Christopher Louis Schmidt, State of Mississippi, United States National Criminal Information Center filed by Merlin Lkent Williams. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Envelope) (JGK) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less