This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/26/2023 at 20:10:53 (UTC).

Williams v. State of Mississippi

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Williams filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of Mississippi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda Weksler and Cristina D. Silva. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00054

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

Presiding Judge

Cristina D. Silva

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Merlin Lkent Williams

Defendants

State of Mississippi

Muriel B Ellis

Jim M. Greenlee

Virginia Carter Carltan

Leslie D. King

Michael K. Randolph

Mollie M. McMillin

Harrison County Sheriff Department A.D.C.

Tray Peterson

Gulfport Police Department

Jerry Birmingham

Harrison County Circuit Court

Christopher Louis Schmidt

Eddwena Marie Myles

Frieda Henry

Virginia Dixie McKay

Cherish Gibbs

Mississippi Department of Corrections

Richard Pennington

5 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 1/31/2023. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (KF) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) MOTION for leave to file by Plaintiff Merlin Lkent Williams. Responses due by 1/24/2023. (LOE) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#4

(#4) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LOE) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice of Change of Address Memorandum by Merlin Lkent Williams. (LOE) Modified text and updated address on 1/26/2023 (EDS). (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#8

(#8) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Merlin Lkent Williams. (LOE) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#9

(#9) MOTION for leave to file by Plaintiff Merlin Lkent Williams. Responses due by 2/7/2023. (LOE) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#11

(#11) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Merlin Lkent Williams. (LOE) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

13 #13

Main Document

13 #1

Prisoner Complaint Form

#14

(#14) MOTION seeking permission to exceed the page limit by Plaintiff Merlin Lkent Williams. Responses due by 3/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(LOE) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

14 #1

Exhibits

#16

(#16) ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint #14 is DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the prisoner, pro se form complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff chooses to amend his complaint, he must do so by May 17, 2023. If Plaintiff chooses not to amend his complaint, the Court will recommend that his case be dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs trust account statement is due by May 17, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Complaint Form) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Copy of Prisoner Complaint form sent to Plaintiff - LOE) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint #14 is DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the prisoner, pro se form complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff chooses to amend his complaint, he must do so by May 17, 2023. If Plaintiff chooses not to amend his complaint, the Court will recommend that his case be dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs trust account statement is due by May 17, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Complaint Form) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Copy of Prisoner Complaint form sent to Plaintiff - LOE) (Entered: 04/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/19/2023. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. #14 Plaintiff's Motion Seeking Permission to Exceed the Page Limit is DENIED. There is no page limit on complaints. However, the more direct and concise a complaint is, the easier it is for the Court to screen. Additionally, Plaintiff is again advised to write clearly and legibly, as his handwriting is difficult to read. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA) (Entered: 03/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION seeking permission to exceed the page limit by Plaintiff Merlin Lkent Williams. Responses due by 3/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(LOE) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF No. 1-1) is dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff chooses to amend his complaint, he must do so by March 24, 2023. If Plaintiff chooses not to amend his complaint, this Court will recommend that his case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Complaint Form) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Prisoner Pro Se Complaint form sent to plaintiff - LOE) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-00054-CDS.BNW. (no image attached) (DRS) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Merlin Lkent Williams. (LOE) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/25/2023. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. #8 is DENIED without prejudice, as it is an incomplete in forma pauperis request. The Court previously ordered Plaintiff to complete a form in forma pauperis application, which it sent to him. ECF No. 5. The Court gave Plaintiff a deadline of 2/8/2023 to do so. Plaintiff may still complete this form and file it with the Court by 2/8/2023. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ECF No. #9 is DENIED without prejudice, as the Court cannot tell what relief Plaintiff seeks. If Plaintiff wishes to refile his motion, he must write clearly and legibly, stating what relief he seeks and the authority the Court has to grant him such relief. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for leave to file by Plaintiff Merlin Lkent Williams. Responses due by 2/7/2023. (LOE) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Merlin Lkent Williams. (LOE) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Change of Address Memorandum by Merlin Lkent Williams. (LOE) Modified text and updated address on 1/26/2023 (EDS). (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/11/2023. ECF No. #3 is difficult to read. From what the Court can understand, it appears that Plaintiff seeks leave to file this "class action lawsuit." To the extent this is what Plaintiff seeks, the Court denies ECF No. #3 without prejudice, as pro se plaintiffs may not bring class action lawsuits. See Simon v. Hartford Life, Inc., 546 F.3d 661, 664 (9th Cir. 2008) (stating that a non-attorney plaintiff may not pursue a claim on behalf of others in a representative capacity).(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/11/2023. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send Plaintiff a copy of the form application to proceed in forma pauperis with instructions for completing the same. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must file the completed form application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full filing fee of $402 by February 8, 2023. Failure to file a complete in forma pauperis application or pay the full filing fee by this date may result in a dismissal of this case.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LOE) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for leave to file by Plaintiff Merlin Lkent Williams. Responses due by 1/24/2023. (LOE) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Merlin Lkent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(LOE) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 1/31/2023. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (KF) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (KF) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less