This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2020 at 13:35:50 (UTC).

Williams v. Sontchi et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 Williams filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sontchi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02306

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Calvin D. Williams

Hamtramck, MI 48212

Defendants

Christopher S. Sontchi

Samson Resources Corporation, et al.

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Calvin D. Williams. (mal) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Amend the Complaint - filed by Calvin D. Williams. (nmg) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #3

Exhibit C

#5

(#5) MOTION to Amend the Complaint - filed by Calvin D. Williams. (apk) Modified on 1/3/2020 (nms). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/2/20. (apk) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Calvin D. Williams. (kmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

2 #2

Exhibit B

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights filed with Jury Demand against Samson Resources Corporation, et al., Christopher S. Sontchi - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by Calvin D. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(kmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#7

(#7) Letter to Calvin Williams, dated 1/3/2020, from the Clerk of Court, regarding summons submitted for issuance. (sam) Modified on 1/3/2020 (nms). (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/3/2020) (sam). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Amend the Complaint - filed by Calvin D. Williams. (nmg) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter to Calvin Williams, dated 1/3/2020, from the Clerk of Court, regarding summons submitted for issuance. (sam) Modified on 1/3/2020 (nms). (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/3/2020) (sam). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/2/20. (apk) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Amend the Complaint - filed by Calvin D. Williams. (apk) Modified on 1/3/2020 (nms). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Calvin D. Williams. (mal) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (kmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights filed with Jury Demand against Samson Resources Corporation, et al., Christopher S. Sontchi - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by Calvin D. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(kmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Calvin D. Williams. (kmd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.