This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/21/2022 at 09:54:37 (UTC).

Williams v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 Williams filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00221

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Earl Williams

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephanie Bartels Wallace

Attorney at Bartels Sherman & Wallace PLLC

Post Office Box 1640

Jonesboro, AR 72403

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Preston

Attorney at Social Security Administration

6401 Security Boulevard

Baltimore, MD 21235

Stacey Elise McCord

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Post Office Box 1229

Little Rock, AR 72203-1229

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/2/2022. (ljb) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Preston on behalf of Social Security Administration (Preston, Sarah) (Entered: 10/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Earl Williams. Social Security Administration served on 9/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wallace, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/2/2022. (ljb) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (wbb) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Earl Williams has filed a pleading that the Clerk of the Court has construed as a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court has reviewed the motion and finds that it should be, and is, granted. Plaintiff may proceed without the prepayment of fees or costs or the giving of security. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to plaintiff, and plaintiff shall serve the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 08/24/2022. (jfc) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT filed by Earl Williams against Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Earl Williams. (wbb) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Security Administrative Record is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacey Elise McCord