This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2022 at 10:25:10 (UTC).

Williams v. Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 Williams filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark S. Norris and Tu M. Pham. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02452

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark S. Norris

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Collette Williams

Defendant

Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert E. Morelli, III

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YESIER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Robert Emmett Turner, IV

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A- Collette Williams Consent to Join

1 #3

Summons to be Issued

#2

(#2) Judge Mark S. Norris and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (btg) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (btg) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of Collette Williams (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Collette Williams of Consent to Join of Ruben Alacon and Jeff McCarty (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Collette Williams of Consent to Join of JaeDa Scott (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Collette Williams as to Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Collette Williams of Consent to Join Dustin Weaver (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE by Collette Williams Consent to Join Dustin Weaver (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by Collette Williams Consent to Join Dustin Weaver (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Collette Williams of Consent to Join Dustin Weaver (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Collette Williams as to Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Collette Williams of Consent to Join of JaeDa Scott (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Collette Williams of Consent to Join of Ruben Alacon and Jeff McCarty (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of Collette Williams (Morelli, Robert) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (btg) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (btg) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (btg) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (btg) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Mark S. Norris and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (btg) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3918061), filed by Collette Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Collette Williams Consent to Join, #3 Summons to be Issued)(Turner, Robert) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E. Morelli, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Emmett Turner, IV