This case was last updated from PACER on 10/10/2020 at 09:40:12 (UTC).

Williams v. Schuring

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Schuring. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M Cain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-02898

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M Cain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barbara Williams

Defendant

Tye Edward Schuring

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Camden Hodge

Attorney at Anastopoulo Law Firm LLC

32 Ann Street

Charleston, SC 29403

Amanda Ruth Itterly

Attorney at Hoffman Law Firm

7087 Rivers Avenue

North Charleston, SC 29406

Kevin B Smith

Attorney at Hoffman Law Firm

7087 Rivers Avenue

North Charleston, SC 29406

Roy T Willey, IV

Attorney at Anastopoulo Law Firm LLC

32 Ann Street, Unit B

Charleston, SC 29403

Defendant Attorney

Patrick Laverne Still, III

Attorney at Clawson and Staubes LLC (Gville)

1000 E North Street, Suite 200

Greenville, SC 29601

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 3/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/7/20. (kmca) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/27/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/10/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 11/10/2020, ADR Statement/Certification due by 11/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/21/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/20/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/19/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/19/2021, Discovery due by 3/22/2021, Motions due by 4/5/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 6/7/2021 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/7/20. (kmca) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#8

(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tye Edward Schuring.(Still, Patrick) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tye Edward Schuring.(Still, Patrick) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

5 #1

Proof of Service

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Williams. Tye Edward Schuring served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(kmca) Document re-filed by clerk to correct event. (kmca) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Tye Edward Schuring. (kmca) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Barbara Williams.(kmca) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Tye Edward Schuring (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9270743), filed by Barbara Williams. Service due by 11/9/2020.(kmca) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 3/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/7/20. (kmca) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/27/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/10/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 11/10/2020, ADR Statement/Certification due by 11/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/21/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/20/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/19/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/19/2021, Discovery due by 3/22/2021, Motions due by 4/5/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 6/7/2021 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/7/20. (kmca) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tye Edward Schuring.(Still, Patrick) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tye Edward Schuring.(Still, Patrick) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Williams. Tye Edward Schuring served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(kmca) Document re-filed by clerk to correct event. (kmca) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Tye Edward Schuring. (kmca) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Barbara Williams.(kmca) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Tye Edward Schuring (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9270743), filed by Barbara Williams. Service due by 11/9/2020.(kmca) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less