This case was last updated from PACER on 03/14/2020 at 08:36:05 (UTC).

Williams v. Saul et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 Williams filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Becky R. Thorson and Patrick J. Schiltz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-00201

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Becky R. Thorson

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bridgette Williams

Farmington, MN 55025

Defendant

Andrew Saul

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/6/2020. (MSK) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 3/12/2020. (CLG) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#8

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 3/12/2020. (CLG) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) EXHIBIT A-F re #7 OBJECTION TO 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Bridgette Williams. (lmb) Document QC'd on 3/4/2020 (JGK). (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) OBJECTION TO #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Bridgette Williams. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(lmb) Document QC'd on 3/4/2020 (JGK). (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • (#6) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is now assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-201 PJS/BRT. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (MMG) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/6/2020. (MSK) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/6/2020. (MSK) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (JGK) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Bridgette Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(JGK) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Bridgette Williams. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Becky R. Thorson per MJ Social Security Appeals list. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.