This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:24:53 (UTC).

Williams v. Roney et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Williams filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Roney. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Audrey G. Fleissig. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03211

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Audrey G. Fleissig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samuel H. Williams

Bonne Terre, MO 63628

Defendants

Theodore Eaton

Craig Fenton

Unknown Roney

Dennis Robinson

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice to the filing of a fully-paid complaint. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/12/2019. (AFC) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding #5 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal). Notice of Appeal filed on 01/22/202 by Plaintiff Samuel H. Williams. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.(MFG) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Samuel H. Williams. (DLB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal) by Plaintiff Samuel H. Williams. (KJS) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983 against defendant Theodore Eaton, Craig Fenton, Dennis Robinson, Unknown Roney, filed by Samuel H. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Judge Assignment Label)(DLB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal (ECF No. #8 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file any future documents or pleadings in connection with this appeal directly with the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/24/2020. (AFC) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice to the filing of a fully-paid complaint. A separate order of dismissal will be entered herewith. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/12/2019. (AFC) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Samuel H. Williams. (KJS) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

1 #2

Judge Assignment Label

#6

(#6) Letter from Clerk sent to pro-se prisoner re:FRAP - all procedures for filing Notice of Appeal (copy of motion to proceed IFP on appeal attached and mailed) (AFC) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#9

RESTRICTED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding #5 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal). Notice of Appeal filed on 01/22/202 by Plaintiff Samuel H. Williams. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.(MFG) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 10. Mailed to non-electronic party this date. Fri Jan 24 09:56:31 CST 2020 (Cordray, Abby) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal (ECF No. #8 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file any future documents or pleadings in connection with this appeal directly with the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 1/24/2020. (AFC) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Samuel H. Williams. (KJS) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Samuel H. Williams. (KJS) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal) by Plaintiff Samuel H. Williams. (KJS) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4,5,6. Mailed to non-electronic party this date. Thu Dec 12 09:39:48 CST 2019 (Cordray, Abby) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Clerk sent to pro-se prisoner re:FRAP - all procedures for filing Notice of Appeal (copy of motion to proceed IFP on appeal attached and mailed) (AFC) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice to the filing of a fully-paid complaint. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/12/2019. (AFC) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice to the filing of a fully-paid complaint. A separate order of dismissal will be entered herewith. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/12/2019. (AFC) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Dec 6 15:01:17 CST 2019 (admin,) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (DLB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Samuel H. Williams. (DLB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Samuel H. Williams. (DLB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983 against defendant Theodore Eaton, Craig Fenton, Dennis Robinson, Unknown Roney, filed by Samuel H. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Judge Assignment Label)(DLB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.