This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/19/2021 at 23:09:00 (UTC).

Williams v. Quantstamp, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 Williams filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Quantstamp, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Loretta A. Preska. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02813

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Loretta A. Preska

 

Party Details

Lead Plaintiffs

Matthew Kuzmeskas

Brett Messieh

Plaintiff

Chase Williams

Defendants

Richard Ma

Steven Stewart

Quantstamp, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiff Attorneys

Jordan Ari Goldstein

Attorney at Selendy & Gay PLLC

1290 Avenue Of The Americas, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10104

Kyle William Roche

Attorney at Roche Cyrulnik Freedman LLP

99 Park Avenue, Suite 1910

New York, NY 10016

Philippe Zuard Selendy

Attorney at Selendy & Gay PLLC

1290 Avenue Of The Americas, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10104

Spencer Andrew Gottlieb

Attorney at Selendy & Gay PLLC

1290 Sixth Avenue

New York, NY 10104

Michelle P. Foxman

Attorney at Selendy & Gay PLLC

1290 Avenue Of The Americas, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10104

Alex Potter

Attorney at Roche Cyrulnik Freedman LLP

99 Park Ave., Suite 1910

New York, NY 10016

Edward John Normand

Attorney at Roche Cyrulnik Freedman LLP

99 Park Avenue, Suite 1910

New York, NY 10016

Devin Freedman

Attorney at Roche Cyrulnik Freedman LLP

200 South Biscayne Blvd., Suite 5500

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Richard Corey Worcester

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Jacob J Waldman

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (NYC)

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Jesse Bernstein

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan (NYC)

51 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10010

Michael Ethan Liftik

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

1300 I Street Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#43

42 #2

Exhibit 2 - Gate Technology, Inc. Delaware Registration

42 #1

Exhibit 1 - Whois Record for QuantStamp.com

#42

#41

40 #1

Exhibit 1

#40

#39

#38

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Rider

#2

#1

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint (ECF No. 38) addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kyle Roche and Jordan Goldstein dated January 11, 2021. Document filed by Matthew Kuzmeskas, Brett Messieh..(Goldstein, Jordan) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) DECLARATION of Kyle W. Roche in Opposition re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT.. Document filed by Matthew Kuzmeskas, Brett Messieh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Whois Record for QuantStamp.com, #2 Exhibit 2 - Gate Technology, Inc. Delaware Registration).(Goldstein, Jordan) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Matthew Kuzmeskas, Brett Messieh..(Goldstein, Jordan) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) DECLARATION of Corey Worcester in Support re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT.. Document filed by Richard Ma, Quantstamp, Inc., Steven Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Worcester, Richard) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #38 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Richard Ma, Quantstamp, Inc., Steven Stewart..(Worcester, Richard) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Document filed by Richard Ma, Quantstamp, Inc., Steven Stewart..(Worcester, Richard) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING: IT IS ACCORDINGLY STIPULATED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the Parties, subject to the Court's approval, as follows: 1. Defendants' motion to dismiss shall be filed by November 13, 2020 and shall not exceed 25 pages; 2. Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss shall be filed by January 11, 2021 and shall not exceed 25 pages; and 3. Defendants' reply brief shall be filed within 30 days of Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss and shall not exceed 12 pages. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 11/13/2020. Responses due by 1/11/2021.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/6/2020) (va) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Richard Ma, Quantstamp, Inc., Steven Stewart..(Worcester, Richard) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER granting #34 Motion for Michael Ethan Liftik to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2020) (rro) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #34 MOTION for Michael E. Liftik to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21912440. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward John Normand on behalf of Chase Williams..(Normand, Edward) (Entered: 04/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Spencer Andrew Gottlieb on behalf of Chase Williams..(Gottlieb, Spencer) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle P. Foxman on behalf of Chase Williams..(Foxman, Michelle) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan Ari Goldstein on behalf of Chase Williams..(Goldstein, Jordan) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philippe Zuard Selendy on behalf of Chase Williams..(Selendy, Philippe) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven Stewart, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Chase Williams..(Roche, Kyle) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard Ma, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Chase Williams..(Roche, Kyle) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Quantstamp, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Chase Williams..(Roche, Kyle) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Rider).(Roche, Kyle) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Richard Ma, Quantstamp, Inc., Steven Stewart. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19332331)Document filed by Chase Williams..(Roche, Kyle) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyle William Roche

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philippe Zuard Selendy