This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2020 at 08:09:07 (UTC).

Williams v. Oklahoma, State of et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2020 Williams filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Oklahoma, State of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gwynne E. Birzer, Julie A. Robinson and John W. Broomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01224

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gwynne E. Birzer

Presiding Judges

Julie A. Robinson

John W. Broomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Djuan Preston Williams

Ulysses, KS 67880

Defendants

Galen H. Pelton

Ronald Masson

Oklahoma, State of

OESC

Grant County, Kansas

Kay Richards

Amy Flores

Bill Wieland

Martin Long

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Exhibit

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to file Redacted Exhibit by Plaintiff Djuan Preston Williams. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sz) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to File Additional Exhibits by Plaintiff Djuan Preston Williams. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Exhibits) (NOTE -- Exhibits include personal identifiers, access is restricted.) (mam) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Djuan Preston Williams. (mam) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#4

(#4) DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Djuan Preston Williams is a registered pro se participant with ECF Notifications only. (gw) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Djuan Preston Williams. (jk) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Djuan Preston Williams. (NOTEExhibits are restricted, they include personal identifiers) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (jk) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to file Redacted Exhibit by Plaintiff Djuan Preston Williams. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sz) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE to Plaintiff Djuan Preston Williams - The exhibits to the complaint (Doc. 1-1) and the proposed exhibits to #8 Motion for Leave to File Additional Exhibits (Doc. 8-1) are not redacted properly. The filing party is directed to correct the deficiencies immediately. See FRCP Rule 5.2. Privacy Protection For Filings Made with the Court. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to File Additional Exhibits by Plaintiff Djuan Preston Williams. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Exhibits) (NOTE -- Exhibits include personal identifiers, access is restricted.) (mam) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Djuan Preston Williams. (mam) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge John W. Broomes for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 8/19/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bw) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/18/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aw) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Djuan Preston Williams is a registered pro se participant with ECF Notifications only. (gw) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE: Case Number 6:20-cv-1179-JWB-GEB, 20-6059 by Djuan Preston Williams. (jk) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Djuan Preston Williams. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status) NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (jk) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Djuan Preston Williams. (jk) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Djuan Preston Williams. (NOTEExhibits are restricted, they include personal identifiers) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (jk) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less