This case was last updated from PACER on 08/04/2019 at 07:46:38 (UTC).

Williams v. Office Depot, Incorporated

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Office Depot, Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gray M. Borden, Emily C. Marks and Wallace Capel, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00390

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Wallace Capel, Jr

Presiding Judges

Gray M. Borden

Emily C. Marks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harry Williams

Defendant

Office Depot, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

S Joshua Briskman

Attorney at Briskman & Binion PC

P O Box 43

Mobile, AL 36601

Defendant Attorneys

Tawanna Blocker Johnson

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

3348 Peachtree Road Ne; Suite 1400

Atlanta, GA 30326

Jeffrey W. Melcher

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

3348 Peachtree Road Ne; Suite 1400

Atlanta, GA 30326

Forrest Page Gamble

Attorney at F Page Gamble PC

300 Vestavia Parkway; Suite 2300

Birmingham, AL 35216

Joyce Louise Dietzen

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

3102 West End Avenue;Suite 400

Nashville, TN 37203

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NOTICE by Office Depot, Incorporated Certificate of Service of Discovery (Melcher, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

21 #1

Corrected Main PDF docket entry [20]

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Correction re #20 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the Presiding Judge's initials in the case number as "ECM" and not "WC" and to correct the submitted date as July 30, 2019 and not July 29, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main PDF docket entry #20 )(cnw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#20

(#20) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Melcher, Jeffrey) (Main Document 20 replaced on 7/30/2019) (cnw, ). Modified on 7/30/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the Presiding Judge's initials in the case number as "ECM" and not "WC" and to correct the submitted date as July 30, 2019 and not July 29, 2019. (cnw, ). (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#19

(#19) Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr., as referral Judge; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cnw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#17

(#17) Pro Hac Filing fee received for Tawana Blocker Johnson re: #12 motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602054344. (cnw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

12 #2

USDC Certificate of Good Standing

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#17) Pro Hac Filing fee received for Tawana Blocker Johnson re: #12 motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602054344. (cnw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#7

***Pursuant to the #7 Answer - Attorney Jeffrey W. Melcher, Louise Dietzen for Office Depot, Incorporated added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, ) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#6

Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #6 Notice sent to Office Depot, Incorporated was returned with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Not At This Address". (No pdf attached to this entry) (kh, ) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harry Williams. Office Depot, Incorporated served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Briskman, S) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plf) Harry Williams. (cnw, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Office Depot, Incorporated; returned to counsel via US mail for personal service by process server. (cnw, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Harry Williams. (cnw, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #2

receipt

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Office Depot, Incorporated.(Gamble, Forrest) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE by Office Depot, Incorporated Certificate of Service of Discovery (Melcher, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Correction re #20 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the Presiding Judge's initials in the case number as "ECM" and not "WC" and to correct the submitted date as July 30, 2019 and not July 29, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main PDF docket entry #20 )(cnw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Melcher, Jeffrey) (Main Document 20 replaced on 7/30/2019) (cnw, ). Modified on 7/30/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to reflect the Presiding Judge's initials in the case number as "ECM" and not "WC" and to correct the submitted date as July 30, 2019 and not July 29, 2019. (cnw, ). (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr., as referral Judge; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding Judge. (cnw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Tawana B. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/30/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Pro Hac Filing fee received for Tawana Blocker Johnson re: #12 motion: $ 75.00, receipt number 4602054344. (cnw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Non-Compliance re #15 Notice of Service of Limited Discovery to Defendant which is hereby stricken pursuant to local rules regarding non-filing of civil discovery. (cnw, ) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES REGARDING NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY) NOTICE of Service of Limited Discovery to Defendant by Harry Williams (Briskman, S) Modified on 7/26/2019 (cnw, ). (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Limited Discovery to Confirm the Identity of Defendants and Motion to Shorten Time to Respond to Same, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/26/2019. (cnw, ) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Limited Discovery to Confirm Identity of Defendant and Motion to Shorten Time to Respond to Same by Harry Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Briskman, S) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Pursuant to the #7 Answer - Attorney Jeffrey W. Melcher, Louise Dietzen for Office Depot, Incorporated added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, ) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Office Depot, Incorporated.(Gamble, Forrest) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #6 Notice sent to Office Depot, Incorporated was returned with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Not At This Address". (No pdf attached to this entry) (kh, ) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr., as presiding Judge; Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case. (cnw, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harry Williams. Office Depot, Incorporated served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Briskman, S) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plf) Harry Williams. (cnw, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Office Depot, Incorporated; returned to counsel via US mail for personal service by process server. (cnw, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Harry Williams. (cnw, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Harry Williams. ( No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Office Depot, Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602053784.), filed by Harry Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(cnw, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less