This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:21:13 (UTC).

Williams v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Williams filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam R Cummings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01880

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benjamin Williams

Defendant

Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandy Michelle Alexander

Attorney at Alexander Law PLLC

6200 Savoy Drive, Suite 1202

Houston, TX 77036

Defendant Attorneys

Helen Guadalupe Mosothoane

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford PLLC

6688 N Central Expressway, Suite 400

Dallas, TX 75206

Brian Andrew Paino

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford

18201 Von Karman Avenue, Ste 350

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 11/16/2020. Discovery due by 12/13/2021. Motions due by 8/2/2021. Trial set for 1/4/2022 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/22/2020) (oyh) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Mosothoane, Helen) Modified docket text on 7/16/2020 (oyh). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #4

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11001022) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Mosothoane, Helen) Modified docket text on 7/16/2020 (oyh). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Wed Jul 22 11:00:03 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 11/16/2020. Discovery due by 12/13/2021. Motions due by 8/2/2021. Trial set for 1/4/2022 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/22/2020) (oyh) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Thu Jul 16 14:00:29 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Mosothoane, Helen) Modified docket text on 7/16/2020 (oyh). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11001022) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Mosothoane, Helen) Modified docket text on 7/16/2020 (oyh). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less