This case was last updated from PACER on 05/21/2021 at 09:53:29 (UTC).

Williams v. Oculeye et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 Williams filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Oculeye. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Franklin U. Valderrama. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01563

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Franklin U. Valderrama

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terrence T. Williams

Joliet, IL 60436

Defendants

Chris

Michael Santerelli

Tony Richards

Perry

Stuart Taylor

Matthew Kasparek

James Quigley

Theo

Valarie

Oculeye

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Terrence T. Williams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (Envelope postmarked 4/8/2021) (ph, ) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER Signed by the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 4/1/2021: Plaintiff initiated this lawsuit without pre-paying the $402.00 filing fee or submitting an in forma pauperis application. If Plaintiff wants to pursue this lawsuit, he must, by 5/17/2021, either (1) pre-pay the $402.00 filing fee, or (2) seek leave to pay the filing fee in installments by submitting a properly completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to do so will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (prisoner version), along with a copy of this order. The Court defers screening of Plaintiff's complaint #5 until his filing fee status is resolved. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Correction regarding #1 (sxb, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#3

(#3) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama for all further proceedings. Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/23/2021. (ph, ) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, ) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

1 #1

Envelope not postmarked

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Terrence T. Williams (Attachments: #1 Envelope not postmarked) (sxb, ) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Terrence T. Williams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (Envelope postmarked 4/8/2021) (ph, ) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAILED Plaintiff a blank application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (prisoner version), along with a copy of order #6 dated 4/1/2021. (ph, ) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Signed by the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 4/1/2021: Plaintiff initiated this lawsuit without pre-paying the $402.00 filing fee or submitting an in forma pauperis application. If Plaintiff wants to pursue this lawsuit, he must, by 5/17/2021, either (1) pre-pay the $402.00 filing fee, or (2) seek leave to pay the filing fee in installments by submitting a properly completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to do so will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (prisoner version), along with a copy of this order. The Court defers screening of Plaintiff's complaint #5 until his filing fee status is resolved. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Correction regarding #1 (sxb, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama for all further proceedings. Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/23/2021. (ph, ) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, ) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Terrence T. Williams (Attachments: #1 Envelope not postmarked) (sxb, ) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Theo is a litigant

Latest cases where CHRIS is a litigant

Latest cases where PERRY(B) is a litigant