This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2021 at 09:57:54 (UTC).

Williams v. Nurture, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Nurture, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Kay Vyskocil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06918

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Kay Vyskocil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Caitlin Williams

Defendants

Nurture Inc.

John Does #1-50

ABC Businesses 1-20

Interested Parties

Nicole Stewart

Shannon Fitzgerald

Summer Apicella

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jesse C. Kodadek

Attorney at WORDEN THANE

321 West Broadwaysuite 300

Missoula, MT 59802-4116

Martin Rogers

Attorney at Worden Thane PC

321 West Broadwaysuite 300

Missoula, MT 59802-4142

Jennifer Shannon

Attorney at Worden Thane PC

321 West Broadwaysuite 300

Missoula, MT 59802-4142

Defendant Attorneys

Katelyn S. Werner

Attorney at GORDON & REES, LLP - DENVER

555 17Th Streetsuite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Colleen Gulliver

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP (NY)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#16

#15

RESTRICTED

#10

#8

#6

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respon

5 #5

Main Document

4 #1

Affidavit Server's Proof of Service

4 #4

Main Document

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/27/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01217-MKV et al..(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/27/2021 before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/25/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01217-MKV et al..(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/28/2021. Responses due by 10/19/2021 Replies due by 10/26/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01217-MKV et al.(rj) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting (13) Motion to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-1217 (as Lead Case) with 1:21-cv-1271,1:21-cv-1473,1:21-cv-1534,1:21-cv-1882,1:21-cv-2101,1:21-cv-2129,1:21-cv-2553, 1:21-cv-3499,1:21-cv-4997,1:21-cv-5344,1:21-cv-5748,1:21-cv-6632,1:21-cv-6678,1:21-cv-6861, 1:21-cv-6918 in case 1:21-cv-01217-MKV; granting (6) Motion to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-1217 (as Lead Case) with 1:21-cv-1271,1:21-cv-1473,1:21-cv-1534,1:21-cv-1882,1:21-cv-2101,1:21-cv-2129,1:21-cv-2553, 1:21-cv-3499,1:21-cv-4997,1:21-cv-5344,1:21-cv-5748,1:21-cv-6632,1:21-cv-6678,1:21-cv-6861, 1:21-cv-6918 in case 1:21-cv-01271-MKV; granting (17) Motion to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-1217 (as Lead Case) with 1:21-cv-1271,1:21-cv-1473,1:21-cv-1534,1:21-cv-1882,1:21-cv-2101,1:21-cv-2129,1:21-cv-2553, 1:21-cv-3499,1:21-cv-4997,1:21-cv-5344,1:21-cv-5748,1:21-cv-6632,1:21-cv-6678,1:21-cv-6861, 1:21-cv-6918 in case 1:21-cv-01473-MKV; granting (19) Motion to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-1217 (as Lead Case) with 1:21-cv-1271,1:21-cv-1473,1:21-cv-1534,1:21-cv-1882,1:21-cv-2101,1:21-cv-2129,1:21-cv-2553, 1:21-cv-3499,1:21-cv-4997,1:21-cv-5344,1:21-cv-5748,1:21-cv-6632,1:21-cv-6678,1:21-cv-6861, 1:21-cv-6918 in case 1:21-cv-01534-MKV; granting (15) Motion to Consolidate Cases 1:21-cv-1217 (as Lead Case) with 1:21-cv-1271,1:21-cv-1473,1:21-cv-1534,1:21-cv-1882,1:21-cv-2101,1:21-cv-2129,1:21-cv-2553, 1:21-cv-3499,1:21-cv-4997,1:21-cv-5344,1:21-cv-5748,1:21-cv-6632,1:21-cv-6678,1:21-cv-6861, 1:21-cv-6918 in case 1:21-cv-01882-MKV. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Other than as described in paragraph two (2) below, the sixteen (16) above referenced actions, only to the extent they name Nurture as the sole baby food manufacturer defendant, are hereby consolidated before the Honorable Mary Kay Vyskocil and shall hereafter be identified as: In re Nurture Baby Food Litigation, Master File No. 1:21-cv-01217-MKV (the "Consolidated Actions"). Every pleading in In re Nurture Baby Food Litigation, Master File No. 1:21-cv-01217-MKV, shall bear the following caption. The deadline for the filing of any motions in the Consolidated Actions seeking interim lead counsel appointment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) is September 28, 2021. Omnibus papers in response to the Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g) motions shall be filed on or before October 19, 2021. The deadline for the filing of any reply briefs is October 26, 2021. Absent further Order of the Court, the deadline for the filing of a consolidated complaint in the Consolidated Actions is sixty (60) days following the entry of an order under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g). The deadline for the filing of Defendant's response to the consolidated complaint is forty-five (45) days after the filing of the consolidated complaint. The Court GRANTS Defendant leave to file a motion to dismiss the consolidated complaint and waives the requirement in the Court's Individual Practice Rules that Defendant file a letter requesting a pre-motion conference. Should Defendant move to dismiss the consolidated complaint, the deadline for the filing of Plaintiffs' papers in opposition is forty-five (45) days following the filing of the motion to dismiss. Defendant's reply papers shall be filed twenty-one (21) days after the filing of Plaintiffs' opposition papers. The parties shall consult the Court's Individual Practice Rules and ensure compliance therewith. Failure to comply with the deadlines or other terms of this Order may result in sanctions, including preclusion or dismissal of claims or defenses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 8/30/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01217-MKV et al. (rj) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:21-cv-01217-MKV.. (rj) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Filing [Proposed] Consolidation Order in further support of their motion to consolidate related actions pending in this District against Nurture, Inc. (including this action), on the Stewart docket. Document filed by Nicole Stewart, Shannon Fitzgerald, Summer Apicella..(Feldman, Lori) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #20 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Colleen Carey Gulliver dated August 24, 2021. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 8/25/2021) (tg) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Colleen Carey Gulliver dated August 24, 2021. Document filed by Nurture Inc...(Gulliver, Colleen) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Danone S.A. for Nurture Inc.. Document filed by Nurture Inc...(Gulliver, Colleen) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Colleen Gulliver on behalf of Nurture Inc...(Gulliver, Colleen) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn S. Werner on behalf of Nurture, Inc. (Werner, Katelyn) [Transferred from Montana on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Caitlin Williams. (Rogers, Martin) [Transferred from Montana on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION for Transfer of Venue Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) Filed on Behalf of Both Parties by Nurture, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Werner, Katelyn) (Modified on 8/11/2021 to add motion event.) (NOS)[Transferred from Montana on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Nurture, Inc. answer due 8/30/2021. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/13/2021. (ASG) [Transferred from Montana on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Martin Rogers appearing for Plaintiff Caitlin Williams (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint) (Rogers, Martin) [Transferred from Montana on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Class Action Complaint served on Nuture, Inc. on 6/24/21, filed by Caitlin Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Server's Proof of Service) (Rogers, Martin) [Transferred from Montana on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Caitlin Williams of Related Action (Rogers, Martin) [Transferred from Montana on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Nurture, Inc. Summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service (TAG) [Transferred from Montana on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2647511 (TAG) [Transferred from Montana on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Caitlin Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) [Transferred from Montana on 8/17/2021.] (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nurture, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katelyn Shea Werner