This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2022 at 08:23:24 (UTC).

Williams v. Murphy Oil USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Murphy Oil USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Arenda L. Wright Allen and Robert J. Krask. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Arenda L. Wright Allen

Referral Judge

Robert J. Krask

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roosevelt Williams

Defendants

Murphy Oil USA, Inc.

Murphy USA Real Estate LKE #21 LP

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard P. Smith

Attorney at Smith Law Center/Brain Injury Law Center

27 W. Queens Way, Suite 300

Hampton, VA 23669

Defendant Attorney

Michael Jay Schrier

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

750 17Th Street, Nw, Suite 9000

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8240197.), filed by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.A, #2 Exhibit Ex.B, #3 Exhibit Ex.C, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Schrier, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2022: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (epri, ). (Entered: 02/10/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit Ex.A

1 #2

Exhibit Ex.B

1 #3

Exhibit Ex.C

1 #4

Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

#2

(#2) Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, ) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#4

(#4) Defendant Murphy Oil USA, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#5

(#5) Motion to Strike Defendant Murphy Oil USA, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses filed by Roosevelt Williams. (Smith, Howard) Modified docket text on 3/9/2022 (jhie, ). (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#6

(#6) STATUS REPORT by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#8

(#8) STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report Req'd by Fed.R.Civ.P.26(f)) by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER denying Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Strike Defendant Murphy Oil, USA, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 4/5/22. (jhie, ) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Howard P. Smith on behalf of Roosevelt Williams (Smith, Howard) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #10 Notice of Appearance. The attorney requesting to appear in this case must file an appearance on his own behalf; the attorney whose signature appears on the document must refile the document. (jhie, ) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Howard P. Smith on behalf of Roosevelt Williams (Smith, Howard) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER denying Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Strike Defendant Murphy Oil, USA, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 4/5/22. (jhie, ) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report Req'd by Fed.R.Civ.P.26(f)) by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses filed by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATUS REPORT by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #5 MOTION to Strike. Document number #5 was filed using the wrong docket event. The document should have been filed as a Motion rather than as a Response. The clerk's office has corrected this error. No further action is requested at this time. (jhie, ) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Strike Defendant Murphy Oil USA, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses filed by Roosevelt Williams. (Smith, Howard) Modified docket text on 3/9/2022 (jhie, ). (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Responsive pleadings to the complaint have not been filed by defendants Murphy USA Real Estate LKE #21 LP and Jane Doe. Counsel is requested to file a status report within fifteen (15) days from the date of this notice. The status report should be in the form of a pleading that conforms to ECF Policies and Procedures.A party seeking reasonable extension of time to respond to the complaint must obtain court approval by filing an appropriate motion with a proposed order. If a party is in default, plaintiff's counsel may file a request for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The request for entry of default should be in the form of a pleading which conforms to ECF Policies and Procedures. (jhie, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant Murphy Oil USA, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Schrier, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. A financial disclosure statement was not filed with the party's first appearance as required by Local Rule 7.1. The party is allowed seven (7) days to correct the deficiency and file the financial disclosure statement. Failure to file the financial disclosure statement within this period of time will subject #1 to being stricken from the record. (epri, ) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, ) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, ) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8240197.), filed by Murphy Oil USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.A, #2 Exhibit Ex.B, #3 Exhibit Ex.C, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Schrier, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2022: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (epri, ). (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MURPHY OIL USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Schrier