This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 09:35:18 (UTC).

Williams v. Ms. Sims et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 Williams filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Ms Sims. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey U. Beaverstock and Sonja F. Bivins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00185

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey U. Beaverstock

Referral Judge

Sonja F. Bivins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald Vincent Williams

Camden, AL 36726

Defendants

Ms. Sims

Dr. Wilson

Dr. Manuel Pouparinas

O. Locke

Wexford Health Sources, Inc.

Nurse E

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

"Statement of Facts"

1 #2

Affidavit

1 #3

Defendants' Addresses

1 #4

Medical Grievances

1 #5

Exhibits

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ronald Vincent Williams. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins/PSU. (cmj) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#3

(#3) Order, Plaintiff is directed to file amended complaint by 6/13/2022, as set out. Plaintiff is also directed to file amended motion for IFP, or pay $402.00 filing fee by 6/13/2022, as set out. Further the Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff 1983 Complaint and IFP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 05/12/2022. (Copy of order, complaint, and IFP mailed to Plaintiff.) (cjr) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronald Vincent Williams to Camden Community Work Center; ref to Judge Bivins/PSU (cmj) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ronald Vincent Williams. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#6

(#6) 1983 COMPLAINT against Ms. Sims, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Nurse E, filed by Ronald Vincent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); ref to Judge Bivins/PSU (cmj) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

6 #1

Affidavit

#7

(#7) MOTION re #6 Complaint filed by Ronald Vincent Williams requesting that documents filed with his original complaint be filed with his amended 1983 complaint as those were his only copies. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#8

(#8) Supplement to Complaint filed by Ronald Vincent Williams. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj) Modified on 6/16/2022 (cmj). (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#10

(#10) Order directing payment of partial filing fee re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to REMIT $13.94 by following deadline: Partial Filing Fee due by 7/17/2022. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee in monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to his prisoner account. Failure to comply with this Order within the prescribed time will result in the dismissal of this action, as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 06/23/2022. (Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff) (cjr) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order directing payment of partial filing fee re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to REMIT $13.94 by following deadline: Partial Filing Fee due by 7/17/2022. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee in monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to his prisoner account. Failure to comply with this Order within the prescribed time will result in the dismissal of this action, as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 06/23/2022. (Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff) (cjr) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENDORSED ORDER denying Doc. #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with leave to refile as directed in the Court's order dated 5/13/2022 (Doc. 3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/17/2022. (bld) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Supplement to Complaint filed by Ronald Vincent Williams. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj) Modified on 6/16/2022 (cmj). (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION re #6 Complaint filed by Ronald Vincent Williams requesting that documents filed with his original complaint be filed with his amended 1983 complaint as those were his only copies. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 1983 COMPLAINT against Ms. Sims, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Nurse E, filed by Ronald Vincent Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit); ref to Judge Bivins/PSU (cmj) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ronald Vincent Williams. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronald Vincent Williams to Camden Community Work Center; ref to Judge Bivins/PSU (cmj) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemark. Mr. Williams called informing the court that he has moved to Camden Community Work Center 1780 highway 221, Camden, AL 36726. He said he has send a request to the court asking for his address to be changed. We have not received the request yet. I mailed him #3 Order, complaint and IFP form to the new address. (fz) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order, Plaintiff is directed to file amended complaint by 6/13/2022, as set out. Plaintiff is also directed to file amended motion for IFP, or pay $402.00 filing fee by 6/13/2022, as set out. Further the Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff 1983 Complaint and IFP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 05/12/2022. (Copy of order, complaint, and IFP mailed to Plaintiff.) (cjr) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ronald Vincent Williams. Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins/PSU. (cmj) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) 1983 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ronald Vincent Williams. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 8/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 "Statement of Facts", #2 Affidavit, #3 Defendants' Addresses, #4 Medical Grievances, #5 Exhibits); ref to Judge Bivins/PSU (cmj) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wilson is a litigant

Latest cases where Wexford Health Soures Inc. is a litigant