This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:56:22 (UTC).

Williams v. Metropolitan Security Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Williams filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Metropolitan Security Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darriha Williams

Defendant

Metropolitan Security Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jack Q. Nichols

Attorney at The Law Office of Jack Quentin Nichols, PLLC

901 S. Mopac Expressway, Barton Oaks Plaza One, Suite 300

Austin, TX 78746

Defendant Attorneys

Erika L. Leonard

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC

301 Congress Avenue, Suite 1150

Austin, TX 78701

Michael D. McQueen

Attorney at Kemp Smith LLP

P.O. Box 2800

El Paso, TX 79999-2800

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Security Services, Inc. (lt) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13038357). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Darriha Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nichols, Jack) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Metropolitan Security Services, Inc.. (Leonard, Erika) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Metropolitan Security Services, Inc.. (McQueen, Michael) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Darriha Williams. (Nichols, Jack) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erika L. Leonard on behalf of Metropolitan Security Services, Inc.. Attorney Erika L. Leonard added to party Metropolitan Security Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Leonard, Erika) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#6

(#6) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by Metropolitan Security Services, Inc..(Leonard, Erika) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Metropolitan Security Services, Inc.. (Leonard, Erika) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by Metropolitan Security Services, Inc..(Leonard, Erika) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erika L. Leonard on behalf of Metropolitan Security Services, Inc.. Attorney Erika L. Leonard added to party Metropolitan Security Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Leonard, Erika) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Metropolitan Security Services, Inc.. (McQueen, Michael) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Security Services, Inc. (lt) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Darriha Williams. (Nichols, Jack) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Darriha Williams. (cj) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13038357). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Darriha Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nichols, Jack) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.