This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/01/2022 at 07:00:08 (UTC).

Williams v. Meta Platforms Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Meta Platforms Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Franklin U. Valderrama. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03470

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Franklin U. Valderrama

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diane Williams

Defendants

Meta Platforms Inc

Facebook Holdings LLC

Facebook Operations LLC

Facebook Payments Inc

Facebook Technologies LLC

Instagram LLC

Siculus Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter J. Flowers

Attorney at Meyers & Flowers, LLC.

3 North Second Street, Suite 300

St. Charles, IL 60174

Clinton Richardson

Attorney at Beasley Allen et al

218 Commerce St

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendant Attorneys

Jacob T. Spencer

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher

1050 Connecticut Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Matthew Charles Crowl

Attorney at Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila LLP

70 West Madison Street, Suite 2900

Chicago, IL 60602

Patricia Brown Holmes

Attorney at Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila LLP

70 West Madison St, Suite 2900

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Facebook Holdings LLC, Facebook Operations LLC, Facebook Payments Inc, Facebook Technologies LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Platforms Inc, Siculus Inc by Matthew Charles Crowl (Crowl, Matthew) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#22

(#22) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Facebook Holdings LLC, Facebook Operations LLC, Facebook Payments Inc, Facebook Technologies LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Platforms Inc, Siculus Inc by Patricia Brown Holmes (Holmes, Patricia) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#21

(#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: For the reasons stated in the motion, the Court grants the Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines Pending Decision of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer #12 . All deadlines are stayed pending a decision from the MDL Panel, and if this case is not transferred under Section 1407, Meta shall have 30 days from the date of the MDL Panel's decision to file its response to the Complaint. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Hearing Session from United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gcy, ) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#19

(#19) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Siculus Inc (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Meta Platforms Inc (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Instagram LLC (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

12 #2

Exhibit B

12 #1

Exhibit A

12 #12

Main Document

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Diane Williams by Clinton Richardson (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Attorney Clinton Richardson's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #4 is granted. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 09/19/2022 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#4

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Attorney Clinton Richardson's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #4 is granted. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Diane Williams. All Defendants. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Diane Williams by Peter J. Flowers (Flowers, Peter) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Facebook Holdings LLC, Facebook Operations LLC, Facebook Payments Inc, Facebook Technologies LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Platforms Inc, Siculus Inc by Matthew Charles Crowl (Crowl, Matthew) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Facebook Holdings LLC, Facebook Operations LLC, Facebook Payments Inc, Facebook Technologies LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Platforms Inc, Siculus Inc by Patricia Brown Holmes (Holmes, Patricia) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: For the reasons stated in the motion, the Court grants the Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines Pending Decision of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer #12 . All deadlines are stayed pending a decision from the MDL Panel, and if this case is not transferred under Section 1407, Meta shall have 30 days from the date of the MDL Panel's decision to file its response to the Complaint. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Hearing Session from United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (gcy, ) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Siculus Inc (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Meta Platforms Inc (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Instagram LLC (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Facebook Technologies LLC (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Facebook Payments Inc (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Facebook Operations LLC (Spencer, Jacob) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Diane Williams by Clinton Richardson (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Attorney Clinton Richardson's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #4 is granted. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 09/19/2022 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-19626891. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Diane Williams. All Defendants. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Facebook Holdings LLC, Facebook Operations LLC, Facebook Payments Inc, Facebook Technologies LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Platforms Inc, Siculus Inc (ak, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Diane Williams by Peter J. Flowers (Flowers, Peter) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, ) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Diane Williams; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19620995. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flowers, Peter) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Siculus, Inc. is a litigant