This case was last updated from PACER on 07/21/2019 at 07:28:32 (UTC).

Williams v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 Williams filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David J. Hale and Colin H. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00373

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David J. Hale

Referral Judge

Colin H. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kikia Williams

Defendant

Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert A. Florio

1500 Story Avenue

Louisville, KY 40206

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin E. Roberts

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC - Indianapolis

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Eric P. Mathisen

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC - Valparaiso

56 S. Washington Street, Suite 302

Valparaiso, IN 46383

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay (EBOC) on 6/27/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. cc: Counsel (AME) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.. (Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

6 #3

Proposed Order

6 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

6 #1

Affidavit of Eric P. Mathisen

#6

(#6) MOTION for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2871424. by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric P. Mathisen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#5

(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal - mailed Notice to Jefferson Circuit Court. (AME) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Roberts on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (AME) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#3

(#3) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (AME) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-02642, (Filing fee $400.00), filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing). (AME) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay (EBOC) on 6/27/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. cc: Counsel (AME) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.. (Mathisen, Eric) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/11/2019 granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the complaint by 6/26/2019. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(TLB) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/11/2019 granting #6 Motion for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(TLB) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 5/28/2019;Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2871424. by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric P. Mathisen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLERK'S NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal - mailed Notice to Jefferson Circuit Court. (AME) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Roberts on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (AME) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (AME) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-02642, (Filing fee $400.00), filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing). (AME) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less