This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2020 at 13:22:01 (UTC).

Williams v. LaVoie

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 Williams filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against LaVoie. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela Pepper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00916

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela Pepper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diarbro L Williams

Green Bay, WI 54307-9033

Defendant

Dr LaVoie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to pay initial partial filing fee by Diarbro L Williams. Plaintiff is requesting that the institution pay the initial partial filing fee from his release account. (tlf)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/29/2020. On or before 7/20/2020 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $0.29 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Diarbro Williams and Warden at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(cb)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) DOCUMENTS related to GBCl-2020-4021 Inmate Complaint filed by Diarbro L Williams.(tlf)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED Summons Forms submitted by Diarbro L Williams. (tlf)

#4

(#4) LETTER from the clerk to Diarbro Williams re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (lh)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Diarbro L Williams. (lh)

1 #1

Ex A Declaration

#1

(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against LaVoie by Diarbro L Williams. (Attachments: #1 Ex A Declaration)(lh)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketINITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $.29, receipt number GB4689-005713. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/20/2020 re #11 plaintiff's Motion for Extended Time to Pay Filing Fee. The court GRANTS the plaintiff's motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to pay the $0.29 initial partial filing fee is EXTENDED until the end of the day on July 31, 2020. Regarding the plaintiff's issues with permission to pay the initial partial filing fee from his release account, the court's order dated June 29, 2020, dkt. no. 9, specifically allows the plaintiff to pay the initial partial filing fee from his release account; however he may do so only if he does not have sufficient funds in his regular account. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Diarbro Williams and Warden at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to pay initial partial filing fee by Diarbro L Williams. Plaintiff is requesting that the institution pay the initial partial filing fee from his release account. (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Diarbro L Williams. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/29/2020. On or before 7/20/2020 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $0.29 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Diarbro Williams and Warden at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dr LaVoie. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Diarbro L Williams. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCUMENTS related to GBCl-2020-4021 Inmate Complaint filed by Diarbro L Williams.(tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED Summons Forms submitted by Diarbro L Williams. (tlf)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER from the clerk to Diarbro Williams re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Insufficient Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Diarbro L Williams. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Diarbro L Williams. (lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against LaVoie by Diarbro L Williams. (Attachments: #1 Ex A Declaration)(lh)

    Read MoreRead Less