This case was last updated from PACER on 07/30/2020 at 09:29:41 (UTC).

Williams v. Kingdom Animalia, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/31/2020 Williams filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Kingdom Animalia, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04157

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pamela Williams

Defendant

Kingdom Animalia, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Paul Force

Attorney at Stein Saks, PLLC

285 Passaic Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom Animalia, LLC served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. Service was accepted by Albert Demonte. Document filed by Pamela Williams..(Force, David) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on October 2, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/01/2020) (ama) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom Animalia, LLC..(pne) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom Animalia, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Pamela Williams..(Force, David) (Entered: 05/31/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Force, David) (Entered: 05/31/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Kingdom Animalia, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20047897)Document filed by Pamela Williams..(Force, David) (Entered: 05/31/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom Animalia, LLC served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. Service was accepted by Albert Demonte. Document filed by Pamela Williams..(Force, David) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on October 2, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/01/2020) (ama) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom Animalia, LLC..(pne) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom Animalia, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Pamela Williams..(Force, David) (Entered: 05/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Force, David) (Entered: 05/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Kingdom Animalia, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20047897)Document filed by Pamela Williams..(Force, David) (Entered: 05/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINGDOM ANIMALIA LLC DBA HOURGLASS COSMETICS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Paul Force