This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/23/2022 at 07:54:35 (UTC).

Williams v. Kephart et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2022 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Kephart. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00197

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sara Williams

Defendants

Andrew Kephart

Tidewater Transit Co., Inc.

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA

American International Group, Inc.

Harvey Fertilizer & Gas Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joe'l Murphy Freeman

Todd C. Comeaux

Attorney at Comeaux Law Firm

2354 S. Acadian Thruway, Suite C

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Defendant Attorneys

Scott S. McCormick

Attorney at Organ & Associates

909 Poydras St., Ste 3000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Michael J. Madere

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT D. FORD

111 Veterans Memorial Blvd., Suite 1670

Metairie, LA 70005

Philip Eugene Reso

Attorney at AIG Staff Counsel

909Poydras Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Attachment

#2

(#2) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/12/2022 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/24/2022. (BLR) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#3

(#3) First STATUS REPORT For Sara Williams by All Plaintiffs. (Comeaux, Todd) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE and ORDER: Removing Defendants shall file a motion for leave to file a comprehensive, amended Notice of Removal, that contains all their numbered allegations as revised, supplemented, and/or amended, without reference to any other document in the record, and that adequately alleges the citizenship of currently named insurer defendant American International Group, Inc., as described in this Order; or (2) Plaintiff shall file a motion for leave to file a comprehensive, amended Complaint, that contains all her numbered allegations as revised, supplemented, and/or amended, without reference to any other document in the record, and that seeks to substitute American Property Casualty Company for the currently named insurer defendant American International Group, Inc., if Plaintiff agrees American Property is the correct defendant Amended Pleadings due by 5/9/2022. Removing Defendants shall file a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. 1332 is met by no later than by 5/16/2022. Plaintiff shall file either (1) a Notice stating that Plaintiff does not dispute that Removing Defendants have established the jurisdictional requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1332, or (2) a Motion to Remand by no later than 5/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/2/2022. (ELW) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Partial Dismissal with a Reservation of Rights to Pursue all other Named Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Comeaux, Todd) Modified on 5/6/2022 to edit text (ELW). Modified on 5/9/2022 to edit the motion text (NLT). (Entered: 05/05/2022)

5 #1

Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss

5 #2

Attachment Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Harvey Fertilizer & Gas Co., Andrew Kephart, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Tidewater Transit Co., Inc.. (McCormick, Scott) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Harvey Fertilizer & Gas Co., Andrew Kephart, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Tidewater Transit Co., Inc.. (McCormick, Scott) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Partial Dismissal with Reservation of Rights as to American International Group, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 5/9/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 5/12/2022 is CANCELED pending review of the #3 Status Report. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Partial Dismissal with a Reservation of Rights to Pursue all other Named Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Comeaux, Todd) Modified on 5/6/2022 to edit text (ELW). Modified on 5/9/2022 to edit the motion text (NLT). (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE and ORDER: Removing Defendants shall file a motion for leave to file a comprehensive, amended Notice of Removal, that contains all their numbered allegations as revised, supplemented, and/or amended, without reference to any other document in the record, and that adequately alleges the citizenship of currently named insurer defendant American International Group, Inc., as described in this Order; or (2) Plaintiff shall file a motion for leave to file a comprehensive, amended Complaint, that contains all her numbered allegations as revised, supplemented, and/or amended, without reference to any other document in the record, and that seeks to substitute American Property Casualty Company for the currently named insurer defendant American International Group, Inc., if Plaintiff agrees American Property is the correct defendant Amended Pleadings due by 5/9/2022. Removing Defendants shall file a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. 1332 is met by no later than by 5/16/2022. Plaintiff shall file either (1) a Notice stating that Plaintiff does not dispute that Removing Defendants have established the jurisdictional requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1332, or (2) a Motion to Remand by no later than 5/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/2/2022. (ELW) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) First STATUS REPORT For Sara Williams by All Plaintiffs. (Comeaux, Todd) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/12/2022 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/24/2022. (BLR) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st JDC Livingston Parish, Case Number 173165. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2409549), filed by Harvey Fertilizer & Gas Co., National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Tidewater Transit Co., Inc., Andrew Kephart, American International Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Attachment)(McCormick, Scott) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIDEWATER TRANSIT CO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where American International Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Stephen McCormick