This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2022 at 07:48:57 (UTC).

Williams v. Hy-Vee, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 Williams filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Hy-Vee, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger and Helen C. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00025

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger

Referral Judge

Helen C. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chris A. Williams

Defendants

Hy-Vee, Inc.

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey L. Goodman

Attorney at GOODMAN/KELLER P.C.

1501 42Nd Street, Suite 300

West Des Moines, IA 50266

Leila Alexandra Amineddoleh

Attorney at AMINEDDOLEH AND ASSOCIATES LLC

43 W. 43Rd Street, Suite 171

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COPYRIGHT/PATENT/TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4723363., filed by Chris A. Williams. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/4/2022. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/4/2022.(Goodman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#3

(#3) REPORT REGARDING COPYRIGHT mailed to registrar with copy of complaint. (kjw) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#4

(#4) ***FILED IN ERROR** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chris A. Williams Acceptance of Service of Timothy J. Zarley on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc. (Goodman, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/10/2022 attorney to refile using correct event to set answer due date (kjw). (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Chris A. Williams; Hy-Vee, Inc. waiver served on 2/9/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. (Goodman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4743593 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Chris A. Williams. (Amineddoleh, Leila) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Leila A. Amineddoleh. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/25/2022. (btg) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4743593 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Chris A. Williams. (Amineddoleh, Leila) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Chris A. Williams; Hy-Vee, Inc. waiver served on 2/9/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. (Goodman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***FILED IN ERROR** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chris A. Williams Acceptance of Service of Timothy J. Zarley on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc. (Goodman, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/10/2022 attorney to refile using correct event to set answer due date (kjw). (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT REGARDING COPYRIGHT mailed to registrar with copy of complaint. (kjw) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 packet) (kjw) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COPYRIGHT/PATENT/TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4723363., filed by Chris A. Williams. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/4/2022. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/4/2022.(Goodman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hy-Vee, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey L Goodman