This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/11/2019 at 07:45:53 (UTC).

Williams v. Howell et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 Williams filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Howell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey U. Beaverstock and Sonja F. Bivins. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00288

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey U. Beaverstock

Referral Judge

Sonja F. Bivins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keith Lamar Williams

Atmore, AL 36502

Defendants

Stephen Billy

Scott Walden

Paige Howell

Bradley E. Byrns

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#8

#9

#6

#7

#10

#14

#15

#16

#18

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ENDORSED ORDER denying #18 Motion for Reconsideration of District Judge Order. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 07/22/2019. (jil) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Reconsideration of District Judge Order re #14 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, #15 Judgment by Keith Lamar Williams - Ref to Judge Beaverstock. (nah) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ENDORSED ORDER denying #16 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 07/11/2019. (jil) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Stay by Keith Lamar Williams - Ref to Judge Beaverstock (tgw) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 7/2/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER ADOPTING the #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ordered that Plaintiff's complaint be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 7/2/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENDORSED ORDER denying #10 Motion for Discovery. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 07/02/2019. (jil) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENDORSED ORDER denying #6 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 07/02/2019. (jil) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENDORSED ORDER denying #9 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 07/02/2019. (jil) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Discovery by Keith Lamar Williams - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (PSU) (tgw) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by Keith Lamar Williams - Ref to Judge Beaverstock (tgw) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Reconsideration by Keith Lamar Williams - Ref to Judge Beaverstock (tgw) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Amend Pleading by Keith Lamar Williams - Ref to Judge Beaverstock (tgw) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Question of Law by Keith Lamar Williams - Ref to Judge Beaverstock (tgw) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: It is recommended that this action be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/20/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/20/2019. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Keith Lamar Williams - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (PSU) (tgw) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Keith Lamar Williams - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (PSU) (tgw) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) 1983 COMPLAINT against Stephen Billy, Bradley E. Byrns, Paige Howell, Scott Walden filed by Keith Lamar Williams - Ref to MJ/Bivins (PSU) (tgw) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less