This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/10/2021 at 19:38:26 (UTC).

Williams v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nannette Jolivette Brown and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03143

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nannette Jolivette Brown

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruben Williams

Defendants

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Home Depot USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Warren A. Forstall, Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of Warren A. Forstall, Jr.

320 N. Carrollton Ave., Suite 200

New Orleans, LA 70119

William E. Mura, Jr.

Attorney at William E. Mura, Jr., Attorney at Law

320 N. Carrollton Ave., Suite 200

New Orleans, LA 70119

Defendant Attorneys

Lacresha D. Wilkerson

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Megan Sara Peterson

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

M. Davis Ready

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Standing Order

12 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2021, at 2:00 PM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Jury Trial set for 11/15/2021, at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Issued by clerk for Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form, #2 Standing Order)(tj) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2021 2:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(tj) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Memorandum in Support of Removal by Home Depot USA Inc pursuant to #9 Order. (Wilkerson, Lacresha) Modified text on 12/18/2020 (jls). (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDERED that Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc. submit summary judgment-type evidence regarding the amount in controversy to the Court by 12/18/2020, as set forth in document. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/3/2020.(jls) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Wilkerson, Lacresha) Modified text on 11/24/2020 (lt). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal List of Parties and Pleadings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings)(Wilkerson, Lacresha) Modified text on 11/25/2020 (lt). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (lt) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot International, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Wilkerson, Lacresha) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, to Plaintiff. (Wilkerson, Lacresha) Modified text on 11/19/2020 (lt). (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, to State Court. (Wilkerson, Lacresha) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2020-08004, M-13 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8604404) filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration, #2 Exhibit B Petition for Damages, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Lacresha D. Wilkerson added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft).(Wilkerson, Lacresha) Modified text on 11/19/2020 (lt). (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lacresha Danielle Wilkerson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan Sara Peterson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Milton Davis Ready