This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2022 at 07:59:51 (UTC).

WILLIAMS v. HARVARD PROTECTION SERVICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 WILLIAMS filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against HARVARD PROTECTION SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY BEETLESTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05581

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY BEETLESTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVELL WILLIAMS

Defendant

HARVARD PROTECTION SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.

Attorney at MURPHY LAW GROUP LLC

Eight Penn Center Suite 2000, 1628 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

BENJAMIN DAVID SALVINA

Attorney at Murphy Law Group

1628 Jfk Boulevard, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

ROBERT S. HAWKINS

Attorney at COZEN O'CONNOR

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

FARA ASHLEY COHEN

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

Four Penn Center, One Liberty Place

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR on behalf of DAVELL WILLIAMS with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVELL WILLIAMS re: Gary Winfrey served Summons and Complaint upon HARVARD PROTECTION SERVICES, LLC by Summons in a Civil Action. HARVARD PROTECTION SERVICES, LLC served on 2/4/2022, answer due 2/25/2022. (MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT S. HAWKINS on behalf of HARVARD PROTECTION SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(HAWKINS, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of service by HARVARD PROTECTION SERVICES, LLC.(HAWKINS, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by FARA ASHLEY COHEN on behalf of HARVARD PROTECTION SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(COHEN, FARA) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER

7 #2

JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 F

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/15/2022 12:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. THE PARTIES SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO CONFERENCE ZOOM INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER, #2 JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 F)(amw) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by FARA ASHLEY COHEN on behalf of HARVARD PROTECTION SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(COHEN, FARA) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of service by HARVARD PROTECTION SERVICES, LLC.(HAWKINS, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT S. HAWKINS on behalf of HARVARD PROTECTION SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(HAWKINS, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVELL WILLIAMS re: Gary Winfrey served Summons and Complaint upon HARVARD PROTECTION SERVICES, LLC by Summons in a Civil Action. HARVARD PROTECTION SERVICES, LLC served on 2/4/2022, answer due 2/25/2022. (MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to HARVARD PROTECTION SERVICES, LLC AND EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL (rf, ) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR on behalf of DAVELL WILLIAMS with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HARVARD PROTECTION SERVICES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15625485.), filed by DAVELL WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(SALVINA, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARA ASHLEY COHEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert S. Hawkins