This case was last updated from PACER on 08/18/2021 at 15:46:59 (UTC).

WILLIAMS v. GULF COAST PAIN CONSULTANTS LLC

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 WILLIAMS filed an Other lawsuit against GULF COAST PAIN CONSULTANTS LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are HOPE T CANNON and ROGER VINSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01659

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

HOPE T CANNON

Presiding Judge

ROGER VINSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ricky Williams

Defendants

Gulf Coast Pain Consultants, LLC

GULF COAST CONSULTANTS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOSEPH TAPP WAECHTER

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN PA - TAMPA FL

201 North Franklin Street, 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

AUSTIN BROCK WHITTEN

Attorney at PITTMAN DUTTON & HELLUMS PC - BIRMINGHAM AL

2001 Park Place North, Suite 1100

Birmingham, AL 35203

JONATHAN STEPHEN MANN

Attorney at PITTMAN DUTTON & HELLUMS PC - BIRMINGHAM AL

2001 Park Place North, Suite 1100

Birmingham, AL 35203

BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK

Attorney at AYLSTOCK WITKIN KREIS ETC PLLC - PENSACOLA FL

17 E Main St, Ste 200

Pensacola, FL 32502

Defendant Attorneys

JULIE SINGER BRADY

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP - ORLANDO FL

200 S Orange Ave

Orlando, FL 32801

PAUL G KARLSGODT

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP - DENVER CO

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

YAMEEL L MERCADO ROBLES

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP - ORLANDO FL

200 S Orange Ave - Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#50

(#50) FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 10/6/2020. (sdw) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#49

(#49) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #39 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES AND SERVICE AWARD. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 10/6/2020. (sdw) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#48

(#48) Minute Entry for proceedings held before SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON: Motion Hearing/Final Approval Hearing held on 10/1/2020 re #39 Motion. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter Julie Wycoff). (pmc) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#47

(#47) ORDER. On September 2, 2020, I entered a Final Order and Judgment Granting Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement (doc. #41 ). This order was entered in error and is hereby VACATED and SET ASIDE. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 10/1/2020. (sdw) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#46

(#46) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING on Final Approval Class Settlement Agreement and on Plaintiffs Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses and Incentive Award (to ensure compliance with Johnson v. NPAS Solutions LLC, - F.3d -, 2020 WL 5553312 (11th Cir. Sept. 17, 2020)before the HONORABLE ROGER VINSON, SENIOR U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE. (kli) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#41

(#47) ORDER. On September 2, 2020, I entered a Final Order and Judgment Granting Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement (doc. #41 ). This order was entered in error and is hereby VACATED and SET ASIDE. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 10/1/2020. (sdw) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

39 #2

Exhibit B

39 #1

Exhibit A

#39

(#48) Minute Entry for proceedings held before SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON: Motion Hearing/Final Approval Hearing held on 10/1/2020 re #39 Motion. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter Julie Wycoff). (pmc) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#7

(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/19/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/19/2019. Discovery due by 12/2/2019. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 7/5/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint filed by GULF COAST CONSULTANTS LLC. (Answer due by 8/5/2019.) Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 7/5/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#5

(#6) ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint filed by GULF COAST CONSULTANTS LLC. (Answer due by 8/5/2019.) Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 7/5/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE SINGER BRADY on behalf of GULF COAST CONSULTANTS LLC (BRADY, JULIE) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to GULF COAST PAIN CONSULTANTS LLC. (sdw) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Clearway Letter to Plaintiff 4.4.19

#1

(#6) ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint filed by GULF COAST CONSULTANTS LLC. (Answer due by 8/5/2019.) Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 7/5/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 10/6/2020. (sdw) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #39 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES AND SERVICE AWARD. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 10/6/2020. (sdw) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Minute Entry for proceedings held before SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON: Motion Hearing/Final Approval Hearing held on 10/1/2020 re #39 Motion. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter Julie Wycoff). (pmc) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER. On September 2, 2020, I entered a Final Order and Judgment Granting Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement (doc. #41 ). This order was entered in error and is hereby VACATED and SET ASIDE. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 10/1/2020. (sdw) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING on Final Approval Class Settlement Agreement and on Plaintiffs Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses and Incentive Award (to ensure compliance with Johnson v. NPAS Solutions LLC, - F.3d -, 2020 WL 5553312 (11th Cir. Sept. 17, 2020)before the HONORABLE ROGER VINSON, SENIOR U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE. (kli) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Sealed Opt-Out List. (sdw) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER granting #42 MOTION for Leave to File Opt-Out List Under Seal. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 09/22/2020. (sdw) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE OF FINAL APPROVAL HEARING. Hearing scheduled for October 1, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Honorable Roger Vinson, Senior U.S. District Judge, Arnow Federal Building, Courtroom 2, 100 North Palafox Street, Pensacola, FL. (kli) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #42 MOTION for Leave to File Opt-Out List Under Seal. (sdw) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MOTION for Leave to File Opt-Out List Under Seal by RICKY WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (MANN, JONATHAN) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul G. Karlsgodt. (sdw) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul G. Karlsgodt.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4550888.) by GULF COAST CONSULTANTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Colorado Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Washington Certificate of Good Standing) (KARLSGODT, PAUL) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/19/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/19/2019. Discovery due by 12/2/2019. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 7/5/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint filed by GULF COAST CONSULTANTS LLC. (Answer due by 8/5/2019.) Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 7/5/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint. (sdw) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by GULF COAST CONSULTANTS LLC. (BRADY, JULIE) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE SINGER BRADY on behalf of GULF COAST CONSULTANTS LLC (BRADY, JULIE) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to GULF COAST PAIN CONSULTANTS LLC. (sdw) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • (#2) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (sdw) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4515616.), filed by Ricky Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Clearway Letter to Plaintiff 4.4.19, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Proposed Summons) (WAECHTER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yameel L. Mercado Robles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul G Karlsgodt