This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2019 at 08:36:36 (UTC).

Williams v. Gaines et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 Williams filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Gaines. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Annemarie Carney Axon and Herman N Johnson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01715

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Annemarie Carney Axon

Referral Judge

Herman N Johnson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eddie L Williams

Bessemer, AL 35023

Defendants

R Brown

Teague

R Gaines

Cook

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT within 60 days from the date of this order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed with complaint to named defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/13/2019. (KEK) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent form the Warden is directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of Eddie L Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/13/2019. (KEK) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#4

(#4) PRISONER CONSENT FORM filed by Eddie L Williams. (KEK) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER - The plaintiff has submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis, accompanied by certified copies of his jail and/or prison account statements. (Doc. #2 ). The application is GRANTED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). The undersigned therefore ORDERS the plaintiff to sign and return to the Clerk of Court, within thirty (30) days of the entry date of this Order, the attached Prisoner Consent Form to signify that he wishes to continue with this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/22/2019. (KEK) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie L Williams. (KEK) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against R Brown, Cook, R Gaines, Teague, filed by Eddie L Williams.(KEK) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT within 60 days from the date of this order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed with complaint to named defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/13/2019. (KEK) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent form the Warden is directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of Eddie L Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/13/2019. (KEK) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRISONER CONSENT FORM filed by Eddie L Williams. (KEK) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER - The plaintiff has submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis, accompanied by certified copies of his jail and/or prison account statements. (Doc. #2 ). The application is GRANTED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). The undersigned therefore ORDERS the plaintiff to sign and return to the Clerk of Court, within thirty (30) days of the entry date of this Order, the attached Prisoner Consent Form to signify that he wishes to continue with this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/22/2019. (KEK) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie L Williams. (KEK) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against R Brown, Cook, R Gaines, Teague, filed by Eddie L Williams.(KEK) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Teague is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK INCORPORATED is a litigant