This case was last updated from PACER on 11/14/2021 at 08:51:23 (UTC).

Williams v. Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Williams filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia Morales Howard and Joel B. Toomey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00926

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia Morales Howard

Referral Judge

Joel B. Toomey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richa Williams

Defendant

Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Philip McDonald

Attorney at McDonald & Barnhill, P.A.

12000 North Dale Mabry Highway, Suite 270

Tampa, FL 33618

David Duff Barnhill

Attorney at McDonald & Barnhill, P.A.

12000 North Dale Mabry Highway, Suite 270

Tampa, FL 33618

Defendant Attorneys

Michael A. Packer

Attorney at Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, P.C.

Suite 1400, 200 W. Forsyth Street

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Corey Kathleen Setterlund

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey

200 West Forsyth Street, Suite 1400

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

15 #2

Exhibit B

15 #1

Exhibit A

14 #1

Exhibit

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment, and MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Attorney's Fees by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Setterlund, Corey) (Modified on 10/29/2021, to edit text) (BGR). (Entered: 10/29/2021)

12 #2

Court Docket

12 #1

Mediation Report Form

#12

(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: Conduct mediation hearing by 11/1/2022. Discovery due by 11/15/2022. Dispositive motions due by 7/29/2022. Daubert motions due by 8/15/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 2/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Court Docket)(JW) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Richa Williams. (McDonald, Andrew) (Modified on 10/26/2021, to edit text) (BGR). (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Setterlund, Corey) (Modified on 10/26/2021, to edit text) (BGR). (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER striking #6 Motion to Dismiss. Corrected motion due October 29, 2021. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/20/2021. (JCM) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss matter or in the alternative motion for summary judgment filed by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/13/2021. (RH) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss matter or in the alternative motion for summary judgment by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Setterlund, Corey) Modified on 10/21/2021 (STRICKEN per Order doc #8) (RH). (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER directing counsel of record to review the typography requirements set forth in Local Rule 1.08 and ensure that all future filings are in compliance with this and all other Local Rules. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/16/2021. (JMF) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet Docket Sheet

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richa Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McDonald, Andrew) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment, and MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Attorney's Fees by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Setterlund, Corey) (Modified on 10/29/2021, to edit text) (BGR). (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docket(#13) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (BGR) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: Conduct mediation hearing by 11/1/2022. Discovery due by 11/15/2022. Dispositive motions due by 7/29/2022. Daubert motions due by 8/15/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 2/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 B before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Court Docket)(JW) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Richa Williams. (McDonald, Andrew) (Modified on 10/26/2021, to edit text) (BGR). (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Setterlund, Corey) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Setterlund, Corey) (Modified on 10/26/2021, to edit text) (BGR). (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER striking #6 Motion to Dismiss. Corrected motion due October 29, 2021. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/20/2021. (JCM) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss matter or in the alternative motion for summary judgment filed by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/13/2021. (RH) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss matter or in the alternative motion for summary judgment by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Setterlund, Corey) Modified on 10/21/2021 (STRICKEN per Order doc #8) (RH). (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER directing counsel of record to review the typography requirements set forth in Local Rule 1.08 and ensure that all future filings are in compliance with this and all other Local Rules. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 9/16/2021. (JMF) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Richa Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Originally filed in St. Johns County Circuit Court on 8/16/2021)(BGR) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:21-cv-0926-MMH-JBT. (SJB) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Johns, case number CA21-0931 filed in State Court on 08/16/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18707670 filed by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits, #2 State Court Docket Sheet Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Setterlund, Corey) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Corey Kathleen Setterlund

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL ADAM PACKER