This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/27/2023 at 08:55:36 (UTC).

Williams v. Equifax Information Services, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 Williams filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul C. Huck and Jacqueline Becerra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-23875

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul C. Huck

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Becerra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Williams

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC,

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

PHH Mortgage Corporation doing business as PHH Mortgage Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel David Lucoff

Suite 415, 3440 Hollywood Blvd

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorneys

Jason Daniel Joffe

Attorney at Squire Sanders & Dempsey LLP

200 S Biscayne Boulevard, 40Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131-2398

Monique Nicole Eloi

Attorney at Jones Day

600 Brickell Ave

Miami, FL 33131

Patrick G Broderick

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

777 S. Flagler Drive, Suite 300 East

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLCS, SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Response/Answer due 2/9/2023. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/19/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

20 #1

Text of Proposed Order

20 #20

Main Document

#19

(#19) ORDER GRANTING #18 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Response/Answer due 1/27/2023. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

18 #18

Main Document

#17

(#17) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. PHH Mortgage Corporation's answer/response to the Complaint due 1/13/2023. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/3/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#16

(#16) ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document, ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. (Equifax Information Services, LLC, Response/Answer due 1/19/2023). Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

14 #14

Main Document

#5

(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint, by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Attorney Patrick G Broderick added to party PHH Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broderick, Patrick) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC,, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., PHH Mortgage Corporation. (aao) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

1 #6

Summon(s)

1 #5

Summon(s)

1 #4

Summon(s)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLCS, SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Response/Answer due 2/9/2023. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/19/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joffe, Jason) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER GRANTING #18 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Response/Answer due 1/27/2023. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, (Second) by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broderick, Patrick) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. PHH Mortgage Corporation's answer/response to the Complaint due 1/13/2023. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/3/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document, ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. (Equifax Information Services, LLC, Response/Answer due 1/19/2023). Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC, identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC, (Joffe, Jason) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC,. Attorney Jason Daniel Joffe added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC,(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joffe, Jason) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint, by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Attorney Patrick G Broderick added to party PHH Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Broderick, Patrick) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING CIVIL JURY TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 8/14/2023 in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck, Calendar Call set for 8/9/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eloi, Monique) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Eloi, Monique) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monique Nicole Eloi on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Monique Nicole Eloi added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft). (Eloi, Monique) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Patrick Williams. Equifax Information Services, LLC, served on 12/8/2022, response/answer due 12/29/2022. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Patrick Williams. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 12/9/2022, response/answer due 12/30/2022. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Patrick Williams. PHH Mortgage Corporation served on 12/8/2022, response/answer due 12/29/2022. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC,, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., PHH Mortgage Corporation. (aao) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Docket(#3) Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (aao) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (aao) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16128923, filed by Patrick Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s))(Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less