This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2021 at 07:36:05 (UTC).

WILLIAMS v. EEG, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 WILLIAMS filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against EEG, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is L. PATRICK AULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00380

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

L. PATRICK AULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIMBERLY WILLIAMS

Defendant

EEG, INC. doing business as EMPIRE EDUCATION GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEUBIA L. HARRIS

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF NEUBIA L. HARRIS, PLLC

203 W. Millbrook Road, Suite 101

Raleigh, NC 27609

Defendant Attorney

HOLLY N. MANCL

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP

227 W. Trade St., Ste. 2020

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 8/2/2021 (Winchester, Robin) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 7/26/2021 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EEG, INC.. (MANCL, HOLLY) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by EEG, INC.. (MANCL, HOLLY) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 7/26/2021 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to R

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by EEG, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(MANCL, HOLLY) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney HOLLY N. MANCL on behalf of Defendant EEG, INC. (MANCL, HOLLY) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

4 #1

Consent Form

#4

(#4) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to EEG, INC. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by KIMBERLY WILLIAMS re #1 Complaint Cover Sheet (HARRIS, NEUBIA) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against EEG, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3048106), filed by KIMBERLY WILLIAMS. (HARRIS, NEUBIA) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 8/2/2021 (Winchester, Robin) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 7/26/2021 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EEG, INC.. (MANCL, HOLLY) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by EEG, INC.. (MANCL, HOLLY) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 7/26/2021 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for EEG, INC. Answer due by 6/21/2021. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 6/8/2021. (Brubaker, John) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by EEG, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(MANCL, HOLLY) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney HOLLY N. MANCL on behalf of Defendant EEG, INC. (MANCL, HOLLY) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to EEG, INC. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by KIMBERLY WILLIAMS re #1 Complaint Cover Sheet (HARRIS, NEUBIA) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EEG, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3048106), filed by KIMBERLY WILLIAMS. (HARRIS, NEUBIA) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less