This case was last updated from PACER on 09/19/2021 at 11:02:22 (UTC).

Williams v. Doe et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Roseann Ketchmark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-03074

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roseann Ketchmark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Titus Williams

Defendants

John Doe

Coinbase Global, Inc.

Kasim Mahmood

Iliya Nedkov

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Silver

Attorney at Silver Miller

11780 W. Sample Road

Coral Springs, FL 33065

Jason S Miller

Attorney at Silver Miller

11780 W. Sample Road

Coral Springs, FL 33065

John J Miller

Attorney at Swanson Bernard LLC

4600 Madison Avenue, Suite 600

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant Attorneys

Kristin A Linsley

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Matthew F Miller

Attorney at DLA Piper US

555 Mission Street, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94105

Matthew T. Nickel

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP US

1900 N. Pearl Street, Suite: 2200

Dallas, TX 75201

Susan A Beringer

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1881 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Thomas H Dupree, Jr.

1050 Connecticut Ave. N.W.

Washington, DC 20036

Wesley Sze

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

1881 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

#53

(#53) ORDER granting extension of time to file proof of service. Plaintiff shall provide proof of service by September 6, 2021. The Court DENIES without prejudice Plaintiff's request to effectuate service by electronic means. Signed on 7/7/21 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Dollar, Jordan) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#7

(#9) ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Jason S Miller for Titus Williams allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#6

(#8) ORDER granting #6 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney David Silver for Titus Williams allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

4 #1

MAP General Order

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

55 #55

Main Document

#51

(#51) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for failure to provide proof of service and order to provide the full name and mailing address of John Doe. Show Cause Response due by 7/5/2021. Signed on 6/21/21 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Dollar, Jordan) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#37

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

14 #2

Exhibit B - 2/25/2021 WSJ

14 #1

Exhibit A - Coinbase Amended S-1

#3

(#3) MOTION to expedite Discovery, With Suggestions in Support filed by John J Miller on behalf of Titus Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/1/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Miller, John) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#2

(#2) Emergency MOTION for temporary restraining order Without Notice Against Defendant John Doe, With Suggestions in Support filed by John J Miller on behalf of Titus Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/1/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Titus Williams)(Miller, John) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE per doc. no. 56 ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion for extension of service of process #55 . Signed on September 7, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion for extension of service of process #55 . Service of process now due on or before 12/6/2021. This case is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending service of process or a motion to lift the stay. Signed on 9/7/2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Brown, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) MOTION for extension of time to Serve Defendants filed by David Silver on behalf of Titus Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/20/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David C. Silver)(Silver, David) (Entered: 09/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Kasim Mahmood, Iliya Nedkov. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Equitable Relief against Kasim Mahmood, Iliya Nedkov filed by David Silver on behalf of Titus Williams.(Silver, David) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER granting extension of time to file proof of service. Plaintiff shall provide proof of service by September 6, 2021. The Court DENIES without prejudice Plaintiff's request to effectuate service by electronic means. Signed on 7/7/21 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Dollar, Jordan) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Titus Williams. (Silver, David) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for failure to provide proof of service and order to provide the full name and mailing address of John Doe. Show Cause Response due by 7/5/2021. Signed on 6/21/21 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Dollar, Jordan) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Order of Dismissal with prejudice as to Coinbase Global, Inc., per #49 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal. Signed on May 14, 2021 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Titus Williams (Silver, David) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to continue Hearing Scheduled for March 25, 2021 filed by Matthew T. Nickel on behalf of Coinbase Global, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Matthew T. Nickel added to party Coinbase Global, Inc.(pty:dft))(Nickel, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Jason S Miller for Titus Williams allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney David Silver for Titus Williams allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to allow Jason S. Miller to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7339835) filed by John J Miller on behalf of Titus Williams. (Miller, John) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to allow David C. Silver to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7339804) filed by John J Miller on behalf of Titus Williams. (Miller, John) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/25/2021 09:00 AM to 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. The hearing will be held via Zoom. Log-in information to be provided to parties. (Casey, Susan) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to expedite Discovery, With Suggestions in Support filed by John J Miller on behalf of Titus Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/1/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Miller, John) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Emergency MOTION for temporary restraining order Without Notice Against Defendant John Doe, With Suggestions in Support filed by John J Miller on behalf of Titus Williams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/1/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Titus Williams)(Miller, John) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Equitable Relief against Coinbase Global, Inc., John Doe filed by John J Miller on behalf of Titus Williams. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7338494. Service due by 6/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Miller, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ellis, Lindsey). (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Coinbase Global, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John J Miller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Silver

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason S. Miller