This case was last updated from PACER on 03/17/2019 at 07:44:49 (UTC).

Williams v. Djansur Samadov et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Djansur Samadov. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Martin and Joseph S Van Bokkelen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00024

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E Martin

Presiding Judge

Joseph S Van Bokkelen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis Williams

Defendants

Djansur Samadov

Temur Trans, Inc.

Interstate Cargo, Inc.

B&M Express, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Andrew Theodoros

Attorney at Theodoros & Rooth PC

8750 Broadway Suite A

Merrillville, IN 46410

Defendant Attorneys

William C Westfall

Attorney at Ruberry Stalmack & Garvey LLC

10 S Lasalle St Ste 1800

Chicago, IL 60603

Edward F Ruberry

Attorney at Ruberry Stalmack & Garvey LLC

10 S Lasalle St Ste 1800

Chicago, IL 60603

Francis P Cuisinier PHV

Attorney at Ruberry Stalmack & Garvey LLC

10 S Lasalle St Ste 1800

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#23

(#23) ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2019 10:15 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 5/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/11/2019. (smb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Djansur Samadov.(Westfall, William) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

20 #1

Defendants' Brief In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss

#20

(#20) MOTION to Dismiss Counts II-IV of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendants B&M Express, Inc., Interstate Cargo, Inc., Temur Trans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Brief In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss)(Westfall, William) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#19

(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dennis Williams. Temur Trans, Inc. waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Theodoros, William) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#18

(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dennis Williams. Djansur Samadov waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Theodoros, William) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#17

(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dennis Williams. B&M Express, Inc. waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Theodoros, William) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#10

(#21) ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Djansur Samadov.(Westfall, William) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

4 #2

Exhibit Underlying Complaint

4 #1

Exhibit Brief In Support

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Interstate Cargo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief In Support, #2 Exhibit Underlying Complaint)(Ruberry, Edward) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Interstate Cargo, Inc.. (Ruberry, Edward) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit Appearance

1 #3

Exhibit Group Ex. B

1 #2

Exhibit Group Ex. A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#9) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Interstate Cargo, Inc.. Amendment to #5 Order,, Set Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, Amendment to Jurisdictional Statement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit A)(Westfall, William) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2019 10:15 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 5/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/11/2019. (smb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • (#22) ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/11/2019. (smb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Djansur Samadov.(Westfall, William) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION to Dismiss Counts II-IV of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendants B&M Express, Inc., Interstate Cargo, Inc., Temur Trans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Brief In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss)(Westfall, William) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dennis Williams. Temur Trans, Inc. waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Theodoros, William) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dennis Williams. Djansur Samadov waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Theodoros, William) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dennis Williams. B&M Express, Inc. waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Theodoros, William) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Summons Issued as to B&M Express, Inc., Interstate Cargo, Inc., Djansur Samadov and Temur Trans, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Proposed Summons filed by Dennis Williams. (Theodoros, William) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against B&M Express, Inc., Interstate Cargo, Inc., Djansur Samadov, Temur Trans, Inc., filed by Dennis Williams.(Theodoros, William) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Interstate Cargo, Inc.. Amendment to #5 Order,, Set Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, Amendment to Jurisdictional Statement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit A)(Westfall, William) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by William C Westfall on behalf of Interstate Cargo, Inc. (Westfall, William) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Francis P Cuisinier PHV for Interstate Cargo, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/4/2019. (mtr) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Application for Attorney Francis Pat Cuisinier to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Interstate Cargo. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3796910(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER In its notice of removal, Interstate failed to allege the citizenship of either the Plaintiff or Defendant Djansur Samadov. Accordingly, Interstate is ordered to file an amendment to its jurisdictional statement by February 7, 2019. Plaintiff may file a response by February 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 1/24/19. (kjp) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Interstate Cargo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief In Support, #2 Exhibit Underlying Complaint)(Ruberry, Edward) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. *NEW CASE* (lhc) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Interstate Cargo, Inc.. (Ruberry, Edward) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3785500.) from Circuit Court of Lake County Indiana, Cause No. 45D11-1811-CT-00811, filed by Interstate Cargo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Group Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Group Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Appearance)(Ruberry, Edward) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.