This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2020 at 09:43:39 (UTC).

Williams v. DABS Investment, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2020 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DABS Investment, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Simpson, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00271

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Simpson, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Williams

Defendants

Lowe's Companies, Inc.

Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC

Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brenton D. Stanley

Defendant Attorneys

Laura L. Mays

Gregory A. Jackson

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A-Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Answers to Requests for Admission

1 #4

Exhibit C-Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal entered 7/18/19

1 #5

Exhibit D-Doc #11 WD of KY

1 #6

Exhibit E-4/7/2020 Tendered Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal

1 #7

Exhibit F-4/14/2020 Entered Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal

1 #8

Exhibit G-Lowe's Discovery Responses

1 #9

Exhibit H-State Court Filings

#2

#3

#4

#5

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER FOR MEETING & REPORT (EBOC) by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 5/14/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/25/2020. cc: Counsel (ALS) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Mays, Laura) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action No. 19-CI-002358. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (JWM) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowe's Home Improvement, LLC. (See DN #1 ) (JWM) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (JWM) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-002358. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-3084271 ) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Answers to Requests for Admission, #4 Exhibit C-Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal entered 7/18/19, #5 Exhibit D-Doc #11 WD of KY, #6 Exhibit E-4/7/2020 Tendered Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal, #7 Exhibit F-4/14/2020 Entered Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal, #8 Exhibit G-Lowe's Discovery Responses, #9 Exhibit H-State Court Filings) (JWM) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less