Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2020 at 08:02:19 (UTC).

Williams v. Core Health & Fitness, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 Williams filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Core Health Fitness, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgardo Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01734

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edgardo Ramos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pamela Williams

Defendant

Core Health & Fitness, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Paul Force

Attorney at Stein Saks, PLLC

285 Passaic Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Defendant Attorney

Timothy Jon Straub

Attorney at Dentons US LLP (NY)

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The application is granted. Core Health & Fitness, LLC answer due 5/26/2020 (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/22/2020) (cf) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#9

(#9) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Timothy Straub dated April 22, 2020. Document filed by Core Health & Fitness, LLC..(Straub, Timothy) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant's time to respond to the complaint is herebyextended to April 24, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Core Health & Fitness, LLC answer due 4/24/2020.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/26/2020) (rro) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#7

(#7) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Timothy Straub dated March 24, 2020. Document filed by Core Health & Fitness, LLC..(Straub, Timothy) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Jon Straub on behalf of Core Health & Fitness, LLC..(Straub, Timothy) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Core Health & Fitness, LLC served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. Service was accepted by Daniela Naki. Document filed by Pamela Williams..(Force, David) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Core Health & Fitness, LLC..(pc) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Core Health & Fitness, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Pamela Williams..(Force, David) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Force, David) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Core Health & Fitness, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18940818)Document filed by Pamela Williams..(Force, David) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The application is granted. Core Health & Fitness, LLC answer due 5/26/2020 (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/22/2020) (cf) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Timothy Straub dated April 22, 2020. Document filed by Core Health & Fitness, LLC..(Straub, Timothy) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant's time to respond to the complaint is herebyextended to April 24, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Core Health & Fitness, LLC answer due 4/24/2020.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/26/2020) (rro) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Timothy Straub dated March 24, 2020. Document filed by Core Health & Fitness, LLC..(Straub, Timothy) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Jon Straub on behalf of Core Health & Fitness, LLC..(Straub, Timothy) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Core Health & Fitness, LLC served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. Service was accepted by Daniela Naki. Document filed by Pamela Williams..(Force, David) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Core Health & Fitness, LLC..(pc) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. .(pc) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Core Health & Fitness, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Pamela Williams..(Force, David) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Force, David) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Core Health & Fitness, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18940818)Document filed by Pamela Williams..(Force, David) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CORE HEALTH & FITNESS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Jon Straub