This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 07:51:16 (UTC).

WILLIAMS v. COOK INCORPORATED et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against COOK INCORPORATED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06705

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBIN MARIE WILLIAMS

ROBIN M. WILLIAMS

Defendants

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED

COOK GROUP INCORPORATED

COOK MEDICAL LLC

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason J. Thompson

Attorney at Sommers Schwartz, P.C.

One Towne Square, Suite 1700

Southfield, MI 48076

Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller

2425 East Camelback Road, Suite 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by ROBIN WILLIAMS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06705-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06692-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00216-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00260-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00264-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00266-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00273-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00277-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00279-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00281-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00287-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00289-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00295-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00297-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06705-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06706-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06708-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06710-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06713-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06720-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06731-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06692-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00216-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00260-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00264-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00266-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00273-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00277-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00279-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00281-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00287-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00289-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00295-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00297-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06705-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06706-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06708-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06710-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06713-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06720-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06731-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier on behalf of MDL Plaintiff ROBIN WILLIAMS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06705-RLY-TAB (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ROBIN WILLIAMS.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06705-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#6

(#8) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/19/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

7 #1

*Restricted*

7 #7

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#6

(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Southern District of Indiana; case transferred to Southern District of Indiana under MDL No. 2570, In Re: Cook Medical, Inc., IVC Filters Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation (ems) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#5

(#5) COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the Southern District of Indiana regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2570, In Re: Cook Medical, Inc., IVC Filters Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation (ems) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Jane M. Beckering under #Administrative Order No. 22-CA-01 ; Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker is no longer assigned to the case (eod) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC (mlc) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mlc) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 12/17/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons Cook Medical, LLC

1 #3

Summons Cook Medical Incorporated

1 #2

Summons Cook Incorporated

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by ROBIN WILLIAMS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06705-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06692-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00216-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00260-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00264-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00266-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00273-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00277-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00279-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00281-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00287-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00289-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00295-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00297-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06705-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06706-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06708-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06710-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06713-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06720-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06731-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL, LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:21-cv-06692-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00216-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00260-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00264-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00266-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00273-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00277-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00279-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00281-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00287-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00289-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00295-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00297-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06705-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06706-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06708-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06710-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06713-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06720-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06731-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier on behalf of MDL Plaintiff ROBIN WILLIAMS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06705-RLY-TAB (Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ROBIN WILLIAMS.Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06705-RLY-TAB(Rethemeier, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docket(#9) Remark - Case Transferred In from Middle District of Florida, Cause No. 3:21-cv-1164 on 1/12/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6704-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Western District of Michigan, Cause No. 1:21-cv-1062 on 1/12/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6705-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Ohio, Cause No. 2:21-cv-5836 on 1/19/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6706-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Oregon, Cause No. 6:21-cv-1859 on 1/12/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6707-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06704-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06705-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06706-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06707-RLY-TAB (LBT) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/19/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Michigan Western; Case Number 1:21-cv-01062. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Southern District of Indiana; case transferred to Southern District of Indiana under MDL No. 2570, In Re: Cook Medical, Inc., IVC Filters Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation (ems) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the Southern District of Indiana regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2570, In Re: Cook Medical, Inc., IVC Filters Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation (ems) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Jane M. Beckering under #Administrative Order No. 22-CA-01 ; Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker is no longer assigned to the case (eod) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC (mlc) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mlc) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Robin Marie Williams in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6621338 (Thompson, Jason) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC filed by Robin Marie Williams (Attachments: #1 Summons Cook Group Incorporated, #2 Summons Cook Incorporated, #3 Summons Cook Medical Incorporated, #4 Summons Cook Medical, LLC, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Jason) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK GROUP INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK MEDICAL LLC is a litigant