This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:22:20 (UTC).

Williams v. Cook County/DOC et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Williams filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Cook County/DOC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon Johnson Coleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07964

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon Johnson Coleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Williams

Defendants

Harris Quouotis

Cook County/DOC

Walsh

Jerome Wright

Aathony Robinson

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The Court orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $31.95 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee, and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order to the trust fund officer at Cook County Jail and to the Court's Fiscal Department. Summonses, however, shall not issue at this time as Plaintiff's complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted until February 18, 2020, to submit an amended complaint and a completed USM-285 (Marshals service) form for each Defendant named in the amended complaint. If he fails to comply, the Court will dismiss the case for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff is advised that he must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is released or transferred to another facility. If he does not keep the Clerk apprised of his correct address, this case may be dismissed. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an amended civil rights complaint form and instructions, a blank USM-285 form, and a copy of this order. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/9/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony Williams for attorney representation. (ph, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Anthony Williams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (ph, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ph, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

(Envelope not postmarked)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Anthony Williams (Attachments: #1 (Envelope not postmarked)) (ph, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAILED an amended civil rights complaint form and instructions, a blank USM-285 form, and a copy of the order dated 1/9/2020 #5 to plaintiff Anthony Williams; EMAILED a copy of the order dated 1/9/2020 #5 to the trust fund officer at Cook County Jail and to the Court's Fiscal Department. (sxb, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The Court orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $31.95 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee, and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order to the trust fund officer at Cook County Jail and to the Court's Fiscal Department. Summonses, however, shall not issue at this time as Plaintiff's complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted until February 18, 2020, to submit an amended complaint and a completed USM-285 (Marshals service) form for each Defendant named in the amended complaint. If he fails to comply, the Court will dismiss the case for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff is advised that he must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is released or transferred to another facility. If he does not keep the Clerk apprised of his correct address, this case may be dismissed. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an amended civil rights complaint form and instructions, a blank USM-285 form, and a copy of this order. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 1/9/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony Williams for attorney representation. (ph, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Anthony Williams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (ph, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ph, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Anthony Williams (Attachments: #1 (Envelope not postmarked)) (ph, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.