This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2022 at 09:24:33 (UTC).

Williams v. CBRE Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CBRE Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrea R. Wood and Maria Valdez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03602

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Andrea R. Wood

Maria Valdez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clifford Williams

Cross Claimants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Defendants

CBRE Inc.

D.H. Pace Company, Inc.

Cross Defendant and Defendant

D.H. Pace Company, Inc.

3Rd Party Defendant

Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kathlen M Ryan

Attorney at RYAN, RYAN & VIGLIONE

209 West Madison Street

Waukegan, IL 60085

Michael Matthew Viglione

Attorney at Ryan, Ryan & Viglione

209 West Madison Street

Waukegan, IL 60085

Cross Claimant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Scott Alan Ruksakiati

Attorney at Tyson & Mendes, LLP

125 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Heather Debettencourt

Attorney at Tyson & Mendes

125 South Wacker Drive, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Mark H Shanberg

Attorney at TYSON & MENDES

Suite 300, 125 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Olivia O Paxinos

Attorney at Lipe Lyons Murphy Narhstadt And Pontikis

230 W Monroe

Chicago, IL 60606

Amanda L. Zink

Attorney at Lipe Lyons Murphy Nahrstadt & Pontikis

230 West Monroe Street, Suite 2260

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Olivia O Paxinos

Attorney at Lipe Lyons Murphy Narhstadt And Pontikis

230 W Monroe

Chicago, IL 60606

Amanda L. Zink

Attorney at Lipe Lyons Murphy Nahrstadt & Pontikis

230 West Monroe Street, Suite 2260

Chicago, IL 60606

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

Stephanie W Weiner

Attorney at Heplerbroom, LLC

70 W. Madison, Ste. 2600

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS. Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 9/9/2022: Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

#34

(#34) Answer and Affirmative Defense to CBRE, Inc.'s Third Party Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC(Weiner, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#33

(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: This matter has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Valdez. The discovery schedule set by the District Judge shall stand. In light of the generous schedule, there will be no extensions absent extraordinary circumstances. The dispositive motion deadline will be set at a later date if necessary. The parties are to file a joint status report no later than 11/4/22 describing discovery progress and advising the prospects of discovery. Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#32

(#32) ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Maria Valdez, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Andrea R. Wood no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/1/2022. (exr, ) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#31

(#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing held on 8/30/2022. For the reasons stated on the record, Third Party Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC shall have until 9/8/2022 to (1) answer or otherwise respond to the third party complaint by CBRE Inc, and (2) file their consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge. The Court adopts the parties' proposed case schedule set forth in their initial joint status report #27 . The parties shall serve Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) initial disclosures by 9/22/2022. Fact discovery shall be completed by 5/18/2023. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 8/18/2023. By 10/31/2022, the parties shall file an updated joint status report setting forth: (1) the status of discovery, including what progress has been made, whether the parties are aware of any discovery disputes that they anticipate will require the Court's involvement, (2) the parties' current views regarding prospects for settlement, and (3) whether the parties require a telephonic hearing and, if so, what matters they feel it would be helpful to discuss with the Court. Mailed notice (lma, ) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#30

(#30) JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Weiner, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#29

(#29) STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report - executed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Weiner, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#28

(#28) ATTORNEY Appearance for Third Party Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC by Stephanie W Weiner (Weiner, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#27

(#27) STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Clifford Williams (Viglione, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Amanda L Zink on behalf of D.H. Pace Company, Inc. (Zink, Amanda) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/12/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE Corporate Disclosure Statement re #1 Notice of Removal, (Shanberg, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/12/2022.] (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mark H Shanberg on behalf of CBRE Inc (Shanberg, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/12/2022.] (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, (Shanberg, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/12/2022.] (Entered: 07/01/2022)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS. Signed by the Honorable Maria Valdez on 9/9/2022: Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Answer and Affirmative Defense to CBRE, Inc.'s Third Party Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC(Weiner, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez: This matter has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Valdez. The discovery schedule set by the District Judge shall stand. In light of the generous schedule, there will be no extensions absent extraordinary circumstances. The dispositive motion deadline will be set at a later date if necessary. The parties are to file a joint status report no later than 11/4/22 describing discovery progress and advising the prospects of discovery. Mailed notice (lp, ) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Maria Valdez, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Andrea R. Wood no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/1/2022. (exr, ) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing held on 8/30/2022. For the reasons stated on the record, Third Party Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC shall have until 9/8/2022 to (1) answer or otherwise respond to the third party complaint by CBRE Inc, and (2) file their consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge. The Court adopts the parties' proposed case schedule set forth in their initial joint status report #27 . The parties shall serve Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) initial disclosures by 9/22/2022. Fact discovery shall be completed by 5/18/2023. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 8/18/2023. By 10/31/2022, the parties shall file an updated joint status report setting forth: (1) the status of discovery, including what progress has been made, whether the parties are aware of any discovery disputes that they anticipate will require the Court's involvement, (2) the parties' current views regarding prospects for settlement, and (3) whether the parties require a telephonic hearing and, if so, what matters they feel it would be helpful to discuss with the Court. Mailed notice (lma, ) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Weiner, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report - executed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Weiner, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ATTORNEY Appearance for Third Party Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC by Stephanie W Weiner (Weiner, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Clifford Williams (Viglione, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ANSWER to Crossclaim by D.H. Pace Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Paxinos, Olivia) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (ph, ) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RECEIVED from Illinois Central; Case Number 1:22-cv-01225. (ph, ) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketORDER TEXT ONLY ORDER: Plaintiff filed a complaint in Cook County, Illinois, alleging that, due to Defendant's negligence, he suffered injury at a store in East Peoria, Illinois. Defendant, citing 28 U.S.C. 1391, subsequently removed the matter to Federal Court in the Central District of Illinois. "Venue in an action removed from state court to federal court is governed by the removal statute, 28 U.S.C. 1441, not by the general venue statute, 28 U.S.C. 1391." Allied Van Lines, Inc. v. Aaron Transfer & Storage, Inc., 200 F. Supp. 2d 941, 945 (N.D. Ill. 2002). Under 1441, the proper venue of a removed action is "in the district court of the United States for the district and division embracing the place where such action is pending." 28 U.S.C. 1441(a). Id. at 945-46. As this case was pending in Cook County, proper venue is in the Northern District of Illinois. The Court realizes that the Central District is likely a more convenient forum as contemplated under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). However, this must be left for another day as the action originally filed within the confines of the Northern District, was not rightly be removed to the Central District. Accordingly, this action is transferred to the Federal Court for the Northern District of Illinois. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 07112022. (EE) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/12/2022.] (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of D.H. Pace's Corporate Disclosure (Zink, Amanda) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/12/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Consent to and Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, (Zink, Amanda) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/12/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Amanda L Zink on behalf of D.H. Pace Company, Inc. (Zink, Amanda) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/12/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE Corporate Disclosure Statement re #1 Notice of Removal, (Shanberg, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/12/2022.] (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mark H Shanberg on behalf of CBRE Inc (Shanberg, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/12/2022.] (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, (Shanberg, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/12/2022.] (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cook County Circuit Court, case number 2022L004686 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3975256), filed by CBRE Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Shanberg, Mark) Modified on 7/1/2022 (JS). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/12/2022.] (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DH Pace Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CBRE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lowe's Home Centers, LLC is a litigant