This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/26/2022 at 09:31:17 (UTC).

Williams v. Captain D's LLC

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Captain D's LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Bruce Howe Hendricks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02033

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce Howe Hendricks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruthmae Williams

Defendant

Captain D's LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Francis Lejau Parker Barnwell

Attorney at Frank Barnwell Law Office

23 Broad Street

Charleston, SC 29401

Defendant Attorneys

A Victor Rawl, Jr

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

Amy Elizabeth McLaren

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

State Court Documents

1 #2

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Captain D's LLC. (adic, ) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by Captain D's LLC.(McLaren, Amy) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#6

(#6) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/27/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/10/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 8/10/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/31/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/30/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/31/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/31/2022, Discovery due by 12/30/2022, Motions due by 1/30/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 5/1/2023, Mediation Due by 12/30/2022, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/6/2022. (adic, ) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 12/30/2022, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/6/2022. (adic, ) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#8

(#8) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Captain D's LLC.(McLaren, Amy) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#9

(#9) Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Captain D's LLC.(McLaren, Amy) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#10

(#10) Rule 26(f) Report by Captain D's LLC.(McLaren, Amy) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Rule 26(f) Report by Captain D's LLC.(McLaren, Amy) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Captain D's LLC.(McLaren, Amy) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Captain D's LLC.(McLaren, Amy) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 12/30/2022, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/6/2022. (adic, ) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/27/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/10/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 8/10/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/31/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/30/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/31/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/31/2022, Discovery due by 12/30/2022, Motions due by 1/30/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 5/1/2023, Mediation Due by 12/30/2022, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/6/2022. (adic, ) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by Captain D's LLC.(McLaren, Amy) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Captain D's LLC. (adic, ) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dorchester County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP-18-00843. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10561935), filed by Captain D's LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service) (adic, ) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPTAIN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer A Victor Rawl, Jr