This case was last updated from PACER on 07/09/2021 at 08:11:11 (UTC).

Williams v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. Brann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00844

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stanley J Williams

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arati C Furness

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Matthew Ryan McCarley

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Steve Schulte

Attorney at Fears Nachawati, PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

201 17Th Street, Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Brian T. Feeney

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1717 Arch St., Suite 400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Caleb J. Holmes

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

1717 Arch Street, 4Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER DISMISSING CASE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/20/2021. (jr) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Stanley J Williams. (Schulte, Steve) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Steve Schulte on behalf of Stanley J Williams (Schulte, Steve) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Caleb J. Holmes on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Holmes, Caleb) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.. (Feeney, Brian) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Feeney on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Feeney, Brian) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#6

(#6) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/12/2021. (jr) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) Case transferred electronically in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-04254 containing electronic documents. (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#4

(#4) AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#3

(#3) *AMENDED by Doc. #4 --FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16984595 filed by Stanley J Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/04/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER DISMISSING CASE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/20/2021. (jr) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Stanley J Williams. (Schulte, Steve) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Steve Schulte on behalf of Stanley J Williams (Schulte, Steve) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Caleb J. Holmes on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Holmes, Caleb) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.. (Feeney, Brian) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Feeney on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Feeney, Brian) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/12/2021. (jr) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred electronically in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-04254 containing electronic documents. (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Middle District of Pennsylvania via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.] (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *AMENDED by Doc. #4 --FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-04254-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16984595 filed by Stanley J Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.] (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arati Furness

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEVE SCHULTE