This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2022 at 08:21:25 (UTC).

Williams v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark H. Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02854

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

La'Keita Montesea Williams

Defendants

BP America Production Company

BP Exploration & Production, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles D. Durkee

Attorney at The Downs Law Group, P.A.

Suite 307, 3250 Mary Street

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Jason M. Larey

Attorney at Downs Law Group PA

3250 Mary St., Ste 307

Miami, FL 33133

Chelsea Nicole Thomas

Attorney at Frye Law Group, LLC

170 Anderson St.

Marietta, GA 30060

Defendant Attorneys

Devin C. Reid

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, PLC -LA

Suite 5000, 701 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70139

Georgia L. Lucier

Attorney at Andrews Kurth LLP

600 Travis Street, Ste 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Kevin M. Hodges

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP -DC

725 12Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Scott C. Seiler

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, PLC -LA

Suite 5000, 701 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70139

Matthew James Calvert

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP - Atlanta

Bank Of America Plaza, Suite 4100, 600 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308-2216

Thomas Wilson Taylor

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP - Houston

600 Travis Street

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) SCHEDULING ORDER re #25 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 2/20/2023. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/23/22. (jpa) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#26

RESTRICTED

25 #1

Exhibit A - List of Active BELO Cases

25 #25

Main Document

#24

RESTRICTED

#21

RESTRICTED

#20

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's #5 Ex Parte Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 7/1/2022. (cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 07/01/2022)

5 #1

Exhibit Proposed Order

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 04/20/2022)

3 #3

Settlement Agreement

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #3

Main Document

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Election Not to Mediate

1 #1

Main Document

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Granting #26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles D Durkee by CRD at the direction of the Clerk's Office. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/29/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #26 APPLICATION for Admission of Charles David Durkee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12014776).. Attorney Charles D. Durkee added appearing on behalf of La'Keita Montesea Williams (kkh) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) SCHEDULING ORDER re #25 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 2/20/2023. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/23/22. (jpa) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) APPLICATION for Admission of Charles David Durkee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12014776).by La'Keita Montesea Williams. (Thomas, Chelsea) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Active BELO Cases)(Calvert, Matthew) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Granting #24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason Matthew Larey by CRD at the direction of the Clerk's Ofice. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/16/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #24 APPLICATION for Admission of Jason Matthew Larey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11988967). Attorney Jason M. Larey added appearing on behalf of La'Keita Montesea Williams (cdg) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Granting #21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Wilson Taylor by CRD at the direction of the Clerk's Office. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/11/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Granting #20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Georgia Lee Lucier by CRD at the direction of the Clerk's Office. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/11/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #21 APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas Wilson Taylor Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11984157).. Attorney Thomas Wilson Taylor added appearing on behalf of BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (kkh) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/25/22. (jpa) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00733. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred to Northern District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 7/19/2022.(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's #5 Ex Parte Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 7/1/2022. (cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by La'Keita Montesea Williams. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO. 1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9284378) filed by La'Keita Montesea Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Charles David Durkee added to party La'Keita Montesea Williams(pty:pla).(Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/20/2022.] (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew James Calvert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W Taylor