This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2021 at 08:19:16 (UTC).

Williams v. Bodenstein et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Bodenstein. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F. Saporito, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00828

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Saporito, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Williams

Defendants

Philip Bodenstein

Rachel L. Stern

Not Classified By Court

Mediator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John M. Mulcahey

Attorney at Munley Law, P.C.

227 Penn Ave

Scranton, PA 18503

Ciara L. DeNaples

Attorney at Munley Law, P.C.

227 Penn Ave.

Scranton, PA 18503

Defendant Attorney

Cynthia E. Banks

Attorney at Law Offices of Cynthia E. Banks

72 Glenmaura National Boulevard, Suite 104

Moosic, PA 18507

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Joseph Anthony Barrett

Attorney at Office of Clerk of Court

235 N. Washington Ave., William J. Nealon Federal Building

Scranton, PA 18501

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

14 #1

Certificate of Service

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

MJ Plaintiff Packet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Joseph Anthony Barrett,Joseph Anthony Barrett for Mediator added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/22/21. (ms) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/25/2022. Discovery due by 2/15/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 4/30/2022. Defendant Expert Report is due by 5/30/2022. Supplementations due 6/30/22. Joinder of Parties due by 7/25/2022. Motions due by 6/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/15/21. (ms) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DISCLOSURE REPORT by Robert Williams by Robert Williams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mulcahey, John) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Saporito in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito Jr. Information to access conference contained in order. Attached scheduling order to be completed and provided to Court 3 business days prior to conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 6/1/21. (ms) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to All Defendants YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 7/1/2021 (ms) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Robert Williams YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 7/1/2021 (ms) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER approving re #6 Stipulation Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 5/28/21. (sm) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE REPORT by Philip Bodenstein, Rachel L. Stern by Philip Bodenstein, Rachel L. Stern.(Banks, Cynthia) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Philip Bodenstein, Rachel L. Stern.(Banks, Cynthia) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint by Philip Bodenstein, Rachel L. Stern. (Banks, Cynthia) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Philip Bodenstein, Rachel L. Stern. Philip Bodenstein waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021; Rachel L. Stern waiver sent on 5/7/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Banks, Cynthia) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Philip Bodenstein, Rachel L. Stern. (Banks, Cynthia) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia E. Banks on behalf of Philip Bodenstein, Rachel L. Stern. (Banks, Cynthia) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Philip Bodenstein, Rachel L. Stern and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 MJ Plaintiff Packet) (ao) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Philip Bodenstein, Rachel L. Stern ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5569135), filed by Robert Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Anthony Barrett