Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2019 at 07:27:15 (UTC).

Williams v. Apple Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00782

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larry D. Williams, II

Defendant

Apple Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James C. Mattox, III

Attorney at The Mattox Law Firm PLLC

2800 Post Oak Blvd, Suite 4100

Houston, TX 77056

Tyne' Nicole Mattox

Attorney at The Mattox Law Firm PLLC

2800 Post Oak Blvd, Ste 4100

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Christopher Trent

Attorney at Johnson Trent Taylor LLP

919 Milam Street, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77002

Raphael Charles Taylor

Attorney at Johnson, Trent & Taylor, L.L.P.

919 Milam St, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77002

Claire C Bonelli

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Tiffany Cheung

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

425 Market St

San Francisco, CA 94105

Christopher Robinson

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster, LLP

425 Market St

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) RESPONSE in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Remand, filed by Apple Inc.. (Trent, Thomas) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#27

(#27) REPLY in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support, filed by Apple Inc.. (Trent, Thomas) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#29

(#29) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Continuance Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 6/3/2019. Initial Conference reset for 6/10/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#26

(#26) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James C. Mattox, III re: #18 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (aveliz, 5) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

24 #1

Proposed Order

#24

(#24) Joint MOTION for Continuance of Initial Discovery Deadline and Initial Scheduling Conference by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trent, Thomas) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

10 #1

Proposed Order Order for Remand

#10

(#28) RESPONSE in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Remand, filed by Apple Inc.. (Trent, Thomas) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#4

(#27) REPLY in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support, filed by Apple Inc.. (Trent, Thomas) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

1 #8

Exhibit Certified State Court Filings

1 #7

Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit List of Counsel of Record

1 #4

Exhibit Index of Matters being Filed

1 #3

Exhibit Annual Mean Wage

1 #2

Exhibit Apple Inc.'s Statement of Information

1 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133rd Judicial District Court of Harris County Texas, case number 201906645 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21992989) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Apple Inc.'s Statement of Information, #3 Exhibit Annual Mean Wage, #4 Exhibit Index of Matters being Filed, #5 Exhibit List of Counsel of Record, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit Certified State Court Filings)(Trent, Thomas) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) RESPONSE in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Remand, filed by Apple Inc.. (Trent, Thomas) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) REPLY in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support, filed by Apple Inc.. (Trent, Thomas) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Continuance Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 6/3/2019. Initial Conference reset for 6/10/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James C. Mattox, III re: #18 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (aveliz, 5) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Joint MOTION for Continuance of Initial Discovery Deadline and Initial Scheduling Conference by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trent, Thomas) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) AMENDED NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 5/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. ( Notice was to correct error in setting type from de. 22)(leddins, 4) Modified on 4/10/2019 (leddins, 4). (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James C. Mattox, III as to Larry D. Williams, II re: #17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (mmarquez, 5) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. In Chambers Conference reset for 5/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James C. Mattox, III as to Larry D. Williams, II re: #12 Notice of Resetting, filed. (ocasas, 7) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James C. Mattox, III as to Larry D. Williams, II re: #11 Order,, filed. (ocasas, 7) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Motion to Dismiss ;( Responses to #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support due by 4/2/2019., Replies due by 4/16/2019). (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Motion to Dismiss by Larry D. Williams, II, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2019. (Mattox, Tyne') (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Tyne' N. Mattox on behalf of Larry D. Williams, II, filed. (Mattox, Tyne') (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James C. Mattox, III re: #3 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols, filed. (dbenavides, 1) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Service of document No. 4 - Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Brief in Support by Apple Inc., filed.(Taylor, Raphael) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apple Inc., filed.(Taylor, Raphael) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Apple Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/2/2019. (Taylor, Raphael) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Judge's Procedures) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133rd Judicial District Court of Harris County Texas, case number 201906645 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21992989) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Apple Inc.'s Statement of Information, #3 Exhibit Annual Mean Wage, #4 Exhibit Index of Matters being Filed, #5 Exhibit List of Counsel of Record, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit Certified State Court Filings)(Trent, Thomas) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant