This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2022 at 13:13:18 (UTC).

Williams v. American Zurich Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 Williams filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Zurich Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02652

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lakisha Williams

Defendant

American Zurich Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Newton Freiberg

Matthew Martin Mize

Rajan Pandit

Tristan Gregory Gruspier

Defendant Attorneys

Heather Shawn Duplantis

Jordan Paul Zeringue

Virginia Y Dodd

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Cade Richard Cole

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Whitener, M) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Zurich Insurance Co. (crt,Whitener, M) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lakisha Williams. American Zurich Insurance Co served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (aty,Mize, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Zurich Insurance Co.(Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party American Zurich Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Duplantis, Heather) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Answer to Complaint, sent to Heather Shawn Duplantis on behalf of American Zurich Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/26/2022. (crt,Whitener, M) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#7

(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lakisha Williams. (aty,Freiberg, Peter) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Zurich Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent American Zurich Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, Other Affiliate Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Other Affiliate Steadfast Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich American Insurance Company for American Zurich Insurance Co. (aty,Duplantis, Heather) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Zurich Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent American Zurich Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, Other Affiliate Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Other Affiliate Steadfast Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich American Insurance Company for American Zurich Insurance Co. (aty,Duplantis, Heather) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lakisha Williams. (aty,Freiberg, Peter) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Answer to Complaint, sent to Heather Shawn Duplantis on behalf of American Zurich Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/26/2022. (crt,Whitener, M) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Zurich Insurance Co.(Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party American Zurich Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Duplantis, Heather) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lakisha Williams. American Zurich Insurance Co served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (aty,Mize, Matthew) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Zurich Insurance Co. (crt,Whitener, M) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Whitener, M) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Whitener, M) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against American Zurich Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5213662) filed by Lakisha Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet attachment)(Attorney Peter Newton Freiberg added to party Lakisha Williams(pty:pla))(aty,Freiberg, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced with non-fillable pdf on 8/15/2022) (Whitener, M). Modified docket text on 8/15/2022 (Whitener, M). (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less