This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2021 at 09:18:01 (UTC).

Williams v. Alletag et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Alletag. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa L. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00048

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa L. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marion Williams

Defendants

Richard H. Alletag

D & M Carriers, LLC

Richard Alletag

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony John Masone

Attorney at Carter Mario Law Firm

100 Plains Road

Milford, CT 06461

Ryan Joseph Veilleux

Attorney at Carter Mario Injury Lawyers

158 Cherry St.

Milford, CT 06460

Defendant Attorney

Michael P. Kenney

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP

185 Asylum St., 6Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Removal Standing Order

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Discovery status teleconference set for 8/25/2021 at 4:30 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. To participate in the teleconference, the parties are to dial 888-251-2909 and enter 2429024# as the access code. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has evaluated the Parties' #11 Joint Rule 26(f) Report and sets the following case management deadlines. A discovery status teleconference will take place on 08/25/2021 at 4:30 pm. All discovery, including but not limited to depositions of expert witnesses, shall be completed by 11/30/2021. Dispositive motions are due by 12/31/2021. If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum (JTM) is due by 1/15/2022, and a bench trial will take place in the month of February 2022 in Courtroom One, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. If dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 9/15/2022, and a bench trial will take place in the month of October 2022 in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month that the bench trial is scheduled to take place. The Parties are directed to closely follow Chambers' Practices #5 --including the deadlines and format of filings--when completing and filing the JTM, which shall be accompanied by the motions in limine. All evidentiary objections raised in the JTM must be the subject of a motion in limine and supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. The Parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than two weeks before the month of trial. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. If and/or when the Parties feel that a settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge would be productive, the Parties may jointly request such on the docket. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/17/2021. (Nault, James) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Veilleux, Ryan) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Joseph Veilleux on behalf of Marion Williams (Veilleux, Ryan) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE re #6 Electronic Service Documents, Response to 6-1 - Standing Order for Cases Removed from Superior Court filed by Richard Alletag, D & M Carriers, LLC. (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Richard Alletag, D & M Carriers, LLC of no pending motions (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kenney on behalf of Richard Alletag, D & M Carriers, LLC (Kenney, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by D & M Carriers, LLC, Richard Alletag, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 1/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Velez, F.) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/13/2021. (Velez, F.) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/13/2021. (Velez, F.) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/13/2021. (Velez, F.) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2021; Discovery due by 7/15/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2021. Signed by Clerk on 1/13/2021. (Velez, F.) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketJudge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by D & M Carriers, LLC, Richard Alletag from Connecticut Superior Court, J.D. of Windham at Putnam, case number WWM-CV21-6921066-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6326581, filed by D & M Carriers, LLC, Richard Alletag. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons)(Kenney, Michael) Modified on 1/14/2021 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.). (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D & M Carriers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael P. Kenney