This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/09/2022 at 07:29:01 (UTC).

Williams v. Airgas USA LLC.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2022 Williams filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Airgas USA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Steve C. Jones and Russell G. Vineyard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04061

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steve C. Jones

Referral Judge

Russell G. Vineyard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francis Williams

Defendant

Airgas USA LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Stephen Mixon, Jr

Attorney at The Mixon Law Firm

3344 Peachtree Rd., N.E., Suite 800

Atlanta, GA 30026

Defendant Attorneys

Cynthia A. Little

Attorney at Alston & Bird

1201 West Peachtree Street, One Atlantic Center

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

Charles Herrick Morgan

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP - Atl

Suite 4900, 1201 West Peachtree St.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit EEOC Charge

1 #2

Exhibit Right To Sue

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Airgas USA LLC. (jra) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#3

(#3) Return of Service Executed by Francis Williams. All Defendants. (Mixon, John) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Airgas USA LLC.. Discovery ends on 4/27/2023.(Morgan, Charles) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons by Airgas USA LLC.. (Morgan, Charles) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#6

(#6) First Certificate of Interested Persons by Francis Williams. (Mixon, John) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#7

(#7) Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 12/01/2022. (ddm) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 12/01/2022. (ddm) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First Certificate of Interested Persons by Francis Williams. (Mixon, John) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons by Airgas USA LLC.. (Morgan, Charles) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Airgas USA LLC.. Discovery ends on 4/27/2023.(Morgan, Charles) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Return of Service Executed by Francis Williams. All Defendants. (Mixon, John) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Airgas USA LLC. (jra) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Francis Williams. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12121244) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit Right To Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIRGAS USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Herrick Morgan