This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 05:01:27 (UTC).

WILLIAMS, JR et al v. ABBOTT LABORATORIES et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 WILLIAMS, JR filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against ABBOTT LABORATORIES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark Falk and Claire C. Cecchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-19713

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark Falk

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSCAR WILLIAMS, JR

Defendants

ABBOTT LABORATORIES

WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES

NOVARTIS VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTICS, INC.

PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

PFIZER, INC.

TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH &DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC.

NOVARTIS CONSUMER HEALTH, INC.

WYETH LLC

ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP

ASTRA USA LLC

MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

ASTRAZENECA LP

WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED

KBI SUB, INC.

ASTRAZENECA PLC

ASTRA US HOLDING CORPORATION

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN MICHAEL RESTAINO, JR.

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller

5790 Fleet Street, Suite 200

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Defendant Attorney

GREGORY JOSEPH HINDY

Attorney at MCCARTER & ENGLISH, LLP

Four Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY JOSEPH HINDY on behalf of ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION (HINDY, GREGORY) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER of DISMISSAL as to NAMED DEFENDANTS ONLY. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/18/19. (jl, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Specific Defendants by WILLETTE WILLIAMS, OSCAR WILLIAMS, JR (RESTAINO, JOHN) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • (#5) STIPULATION AND TEXT ORDER of DISMISSAL as to NAMED DEFENDANTS ONLY. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/5/19. (jl, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Specific Defendants by WILLETTE WILLIAMS, OSCAR WILLIAMS, JR (RESTAINO, JOHN) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Member Case Direct File on 11/4/19, for MDL 2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II). (jc, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • For all Case Management Orders #click here (jc, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ASTRA US HOLDING CORPORATION, ASTRA USA LLC, ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA PLC, KBI SUB, INC., MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CONSUMER HEALTH, INC., NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVARTIS INSTITUTES FOR BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH, INC., NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION, NOVARTIS VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTICS, INC., PFIZER, INC., PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY, TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH &DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TAP PHARMACEUTIAL PRODUCTS, INC. F/K/A TAP HOLDINGS INC., THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, WYETH LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES, ZENECA INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by OSCAR WILLIAMS, JR, WILLETTE WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RESTAINO, JOHN) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint (ECF No. 1) submitted by John M. Restaino, Jr. on 11/1/19 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jc, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ASTRA US HOLDING CORPORATION, ASTRA USA LLC, ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA PLC, KBI SUB, INC., MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CONSUMER HEALTH, INC., NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVARTIS INSTITUTES FOR BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH, INC., NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION, NOVARTIS VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTICS, INC., PFIZER, INC., PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY, TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH &DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC., THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, WYETH LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES, ZENECA INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10080065) with JURY DEMAND, filed by OSCAR WILLIAMS, JR, WILLETTE WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RESTAINO, JOHN) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KBI SUB, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES is a litigant