This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2021 at 08:55:15 (UTC).

WILLIAMS et al v. MIDWESTERN PET FOODS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 WILLIAMS filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against MIDWESTERN PET FOODS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00022

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Christina Kennedy

Vollie Griffin

Mel Lafebre

Owen Woodall

Harvey E. Williams

Defendant

Midwestern Pet Foods, Inc.

20 Nw 1St Street

Evansville, IN 47708

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John P. Young

Attorney at YOUNG & YOUNG

128 North Delaware Street, Third Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Rosemary M. Rivas

Attorney at GIBBS LAW GROUP, LLP

505 14Th Street, Suite 1110

Oakland, CA 94612

David K. Stein

Attorney at GIBBS LAW GROUP, LLP

505 14Th Street, Suite 1110

Oakland, CA 94612

Mark H. Troutman

Attorney at GIBBS LAW GROUP LLP

505 14Th Street, Suite 1110

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

#16

15 #2

Text of Proposed Order

15 #1

Exhibit A - Troutman Certification

#15

14 #1

Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Exhibit Certificate of David K. Stein

#9

8 #2

Text of Proposed Order

8 #1

Exhibit Certification of Rosemary Rivas

#8

#7

#6

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Mark H. Troutman for VOLLIE GRIFFIN,Mark H. Troutman for MEL LAFEBRE,Mark H. Troutman for HARVEY E. WILLIAMS,Mark H. Troutman for OWEN WOODALL added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/3/2021. (JRB) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark Troutman to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6436470), filed by Plaintiffs VOLLIE GRIFFIN, CHRISTINA KENNEDY, MEL LAFEBRE, HARVEY E. WILLIAMS, OWEN WOODALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Troutman Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, John) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate, filed by Plaintiffs VOLLIE GRIFFIN, CHRISTINA KENNEDY, MEL LAFEBRE, HARVEY E. WILLIAMS, OWEN WOODALL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate) (Young, John) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Marginal Entry Approving #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Claims of Plaintiff Christina Kennedy against Midwestern Pet Foods, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/16/2021.(JRB) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff CHRISTINA KENNEDY. (Young, John) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney David K. Stein for VOLLIE GRIFFIN,David K. Stein for CHRISTINA KENNEDY,David K. Stein for MEL LAFEBRE,David K. Stein for HARVEY E. WILLIAMS,David K. Stein for OWEN WOODALL added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/5/2021. (JRB) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Rosemary M. Rivas Gibbs for VOLLIE GRIFFIN,Rosemary M. Rivas Gibbs for CHRISTINA KENNEDY,Rosemary M. Rivas Gibbs for MEL LAFEBRE,Rosemary M. Rivas Gibbs for HARVEY E. WILLIAMS,Rosemary M. Rivas Gibbs for OWEN WOODALL added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/5/2021. (JRB) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Attorney(s) David K. Stein to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6398792), filed by Plaintiffs VOLLIE GRIFFIN, CHRISTINA KENNEDY, MEL LAFEBRE, HARVEY E. WILLIAMS, OWEN WOODALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of David K. Stein, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Attorney(s) Rosemary M. Rivas to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6398769), filed by Plaintiffs VOLLIE GRIFFIN, CHRISTINA KENNEDY, MEL LAFEBRE, HARVEY E. WILLIAMS, OWEN WOODALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Rosemary Rivas, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Midwestern Pet Food, Inc., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Young, John) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to MIDWESTERN PET FOODS, INC.(JRB) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to Midwestern Pet Foods, Inc.. (Young, John) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiffs Vollie Griffin, Christina Kennedy, Mel Lafebre, Harvey E. Williams, Owen Woodall. (Young, John) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Young on behalf of Plaintiffs Vollie Griffin, Christina Kennedy, Mel Lafebre, Harvey E. Williams, Owen Woodall. (Young, John) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action against Midwestern Pet Foods, Inc., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6388381) (Young, John) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDWESTERN PET FOODS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John P. Young

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David K Stein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark H Troutman