This case was last updated from PACER on 06/22/2021 at 14:50:16 (UTC).

Williams et al v. Martin-Brower Company LLC

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 Williams filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Martin-Brower Company LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Godbey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00926

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ethan Williams

Tianda Williams

Defendant

Martin-Brower Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John M Cummings

Attorney at Stephens, Anderson & Cummings LLP

4200 West Vickery Blvd

Fort Worth, TX 76107

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Ethan Williams, Tianda Williams (Cummings, John) Modified event text on 5/10/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Martin-Brower Company LLC. (ndt) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action filed by Ethan Williams. (Cummings, John) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethan Williams, Tianda Williams identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Reyes Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Reyes Holdings Inc for Ethan Williams, Tianda Williams. (Cummings, John) Modified docket text on 4/23/2021 (oyh). (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Martin-Brower Company, LLC filed by Ethan Williams. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11829551) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cummings, John) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #6 NOTICE of Dismissal. (jmg) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Ethan Williams, Tianda Williams (Cummings, John) Modified event text on 5/10/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Martin-Brower Company LLC. (ndt) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action filed by Ethan Williams. (Cummings, John) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethan Williams, Tianda Williams identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Reyes Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Reyes Holdings Inc for Ethan Williams, Tianda Williams. (Cummings, John) Modified docket text on 4/23/2021 (oyh). (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Martin-Brower Company, LLC filed by Ethan Williams. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11829551) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cummings, John) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Martin-Brower Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M Cummings