This case was last updated from PACER on 09/06/2021 at 09:39:19 (UTC).

Williams et al v. Lines, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Lines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02218

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jacqueline A. Williams

Rosaline Webster

Defendant

Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald George DeSimone

Attorney at DeSimone Law Office

4635 Southwest Freeway, Suite 850

Houston, TX 77027

David Emmett Chapin

Attorney at Attorney At Law

3120 Sw Fwy, Ste 555

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

Hamed Moradi Roodposhti

Attorney at The Fuentes Firm, PC

5507 Louetta Rd., Ste. A

Spring, TX 77379

David Patrick Helmey

Attorney at The Fuentes Firm PC

5507 Louetta Road, Suite A

Spring, TX 77379

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Minute entry for proceedings before Judge Charles Eskridge. Initial conference. Parties present in person. The Court addressed the scheduling and docket control order and the parties' joint discovery/case management plan. Dkts 4, 18. The parties were advised to give notice when and if they would like to be referred to the Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference. Appearances: Donald George DeSimone f/ Plaintiff's; Hamed Moradi Roodposhti, David Patrick Helmey f/ Defendant. Ct Reporter: ERO. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

#9

(#9) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Jacqueline A. Williams, filed.(Chapin, David) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#8

(#8) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc., filed.(Moradi Roodposhti, Hamed) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jacqueline A. Williams, filed.(Chapin, David) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc., filed.(Moradi Roodposhti, Hamed) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc., filed.(Moradi Roodposhti, Hamed) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 11/02/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 10/01/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 05/03/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 06/02/2022. Discovery due by 07/19/2022. Mediation due by 10/04/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 08/18/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 08/18/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/03/2022. Docket Call set for 12/19/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi) (Entered: 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/1/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#2

(#2) RESPONSE To Plaintiffs' Original Petition, filed by Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc.. (Helmey, David) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 190th District Court of Harris County Texas, case number 2021-34895 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26715978) filed by Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Helmey, David) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Minute entry for proceedings before Judge Charles Eskridge. Initial conference. Parties present in person. The Court addressed the scheduling and docket control order and the parties' joint discovery/case management plan. Dkts 4, 18. The parties were advised to give notice when and if they would like to be referred to the Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference. Appearances: Donald George DeSimone f/ Plaintiff's; Hamed Moradi Roodposhti, David Patrick Helmey f/ Defendant. Ct Reporter: ERO. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Jacqueline A. Williams, filed.(Chapin, David) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc., filed.(Moradi Roodposhti, Hamed) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jacqueline A. Williams, filed.(Chapin, David) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc., filed.(Moradi Roodposhti, Hamed) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc., filed.(Moradi Roodposhti, Hamed) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 11/02/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 10/01/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 05/03/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 06/02/2022. Discovery due by 07/19/2022. Mediation due by 10/04/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 08/18/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 08/18/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/03/2022. Docket Call set for 12/19/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi) (Entered: 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/1/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RESPONSE To Plaintiffs' Original Petition, filed by Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc.. (Helmey, David) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 190th District Court of Harris County Texas, case number 2021-34895 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26715978) filed by Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Helmey, David) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Patrick Helmey